Arruda v. Perdomo et al
Plaintiff: David Arruda
Defendant: Jose Perdomo and Cold Storage Trucking LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11562
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jose Perdomo.(McLaughlin, James)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 COLD STORAGE TRUCKING, LLCS ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cold Storage Trucking LLC.(McLaughlin, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by David Arruda. Jose Perdomo served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. Acknowledgement filed by David Arruda. (Resmini, Adam)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by David Arruda. Cold Storage Trucking LLC served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. Acknowledgement filed by David Arruda. (Resmini, Adam)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cold Storage Trucking LLC, Jose Perdomo. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by David Arruda. (Resmini, Adam)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Document(s) submitted by David Arruda. Document received: summons. (Attachments: #1 summons)(Resmini, Adam)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8381997 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by David Arruda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Resmini, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arruda v. Perdomo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Perdomo
Represented By: James M. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cold Storage Trucking LLC
Represented By: James M. McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Arruda
Represented By: Adam J. Resmini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?