Patane v. Babson College et al
Plaintiff: Sebastino Patane and Sebastiano Patane
Defendant: Michael Cummings, Jessica Hose, Babson College and Mark Potter
Case Number: 1:2020cv11603
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 19 Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sebastiano Patane. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Cummings, Mark Potter, Babson College, Jessica Hose, filed by Sebastiano Patane.(McDonagh, Christina)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff's motion to amend, [ECF No. #10 ], is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a copy of the amended complaint and serve it on all Defendants. Because Plaintiff's amendments are not substantive, Defendants do not need to file a new motion to dismiss. The Court notes that, although it is allowing Plaintiff to amend his complaint to make corrections, this does not constitute a ruling on the merits of Defendants' argument regarding res judicata. See [ECF No. #16 ]. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Babson College, Michael Cummings, Jessica Hose, Mark Potter. (Sibbernsen, Kevin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Babson College, Michael Cummings, Jessica Hose, Mark Potter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Patane I, Dkt. 1-3 (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B. Patane I, Dkt. 31 (Order), #3 Exhibit C. Patane I, Dkt. 32 (Judgement))(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin R. Davis on behalf of Babson College, Michael Cummings, Jessica Hose, Mark Potter (Davis, Benjamin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Babson College, Michael Cummings, Jessica Hose, Mark Potter.(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Sibbernsen on behalf of Babson College, Michael Cummings, Jessica Hose, Mark Potter (Sibbernsen, Kevin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Sebastiano Patane. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Sebastiano Patane.(McDonagh, Christina)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Babson College served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Michael Cummings served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Mark Potter served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jessica Hose served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee/payment: $400.00, receipt number 1BST081598 for #1 Complaint (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sebastino Patane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Form, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Cover Letter) (Kelly, Danielle)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sebastino Patane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Catergory Form)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patane v. Babson College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cummings
Represented By: Benjamin R. Davis
Represented By: Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Hose
Represented By: Benjamin R. Davis
Represented By: Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babson College
Represented By: Benjamin R. Davis
Represented By: Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Potter
Represented By: Benjamin R. Davis
Represented By: Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastino Patane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastiano Patane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?