Seshan v. Spaulding
Petitioner: Ramesh Seshan
Respondent: Warden Spaulding
Case Number: 1:2020cv11663
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: David H Hennessy
Referring Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 Copy re #5 Report and Recommendations, Order Reassigning Case mailed to Ramesh Seshan #92228-054 DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 879 AYER, MA 01432 on 11/9/20. (King, Dawn)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered. ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Ramesh Seshan. ( Objections to R&R due by 11/20/2020).(King, Dawn)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Timothy S. HillmanMJ: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filing fee. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant 28 U.S.C. 2241 With Memorandum of Law by Ramesh Seshan.(Castilla, Francis)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Ramesh Seshan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seshan v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramesh Seshan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?