Sullivan v. Salewa USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Conor Sullivan
Defendant: Backcountry.com, LLC, Salewa North America, LLC and Salewa USA, LLC. doing business as Salewa North America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11716
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Keenan, Trevor)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2020 03:15 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Indira Talwani. (Teleconference # 888-808-6929 access code: 8523158.) (MacDonald, Gail)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Keenan, Trevor)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Backcountry.com, LLC. (Keenan, Trevor)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Backcountry.com, LLC.(Keenan, Trevor)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor J. Keenan on behalf of Backcountry.com, LLC (Keenan, Trevor)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Salewa USA, LLC..(Keenan, Trevor)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Salewa North America, LLC. (Keenan, Trevor)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Salewa North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mountain Experience Beteiligungs-Holdings GmbH for Salewa North America, LLC.. (Keenan, Trevor)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor J. Keenan on behalf of Salewa North America, LLC (Keenan, Trevor)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Salewa North America, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8422783 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Colorado Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C: Deleware & Utah Secretary of State Records, #4 Exhibit D: Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Keenan, Trevor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Salewa USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backcountry.com, LLC
Represented By: Trevor J. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salewa North America, LLC
Represented By: Trevor J. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salewa USA, LLC. doing business as Salewa North America, LLC
Represented By: Trevor J. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conor Sullivan
Represented By: Joseph R. Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?