Harrington v. Lesley University et al
Plaintiff: Micki Harrington
Defendant: Hedi BenAicha and Lesley University
Case Number: 1:2020cv11718
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 22 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #21 Plaintiff's Assented to Motion to Extend Filing Deadline for Opposition to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint until 11/18/2020. (Beatty, Barbara)
November 9, 2020 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 18, 2020 to File Opposition to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Micki Harrington.(Klein, Benjamin)
October 29, 2020 Filing 20 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. (Beatty, Barbara)
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER finding as moot #8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, in light of the filing of the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint #16 . (Beatty, Barbara)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Counts I through XI filed by Hedi BenAicha, Lesley University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sloane, Matthew)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Counts I through XI filed by Hedi BenAicha, Lesley University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sloane, Matthew) Modified on 10/29/2020 to indicate that this is an incomplete filing. Complete filing is at ECF #18 (McDonagh, Christina).
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Counts I through XI by Hedi BenAicha, Lesley University.(Sloane, Matthew)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 Hedi BenAicha ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Hedi BenAicha.(Lannon, Paul)
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 STATE COURT Record. (Lannon, Paul)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Klein, Benjamin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Micki Harrington.(Klein, Benjamin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Lesley University.(Sloane, Matthew)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-IV, VI and VII) filed by Micki Harrington. (Klein, Benjamin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-IV, VI and VII) filed by Lesley University. (Lannon, Paul)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Counts I-IV, VI and VII) by Lesley University.(Lannon, Paul)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant Hedi BenAicha ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hedi BenAicha.(Lannon, Paul)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Sloane on behalf of Hedi BenAicha, Lesley University (Sloane, Matthew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul G. Lannon, Jr on behalf of Hedi BenAicha, Lesley University (Lannon, Paul)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lesley University. (Lannon, Paul)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lesley University ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8423647 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Lannon, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. Lesley University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hedi BenAicha
Represented By: Matthew W. Sloane
Represented By: Paul G. Lannon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley University
Represented By: Matthew W. Sloane
Represented By: Paul G. Lannon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micki Harrington
Represented By: Benjamin S. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?