In the matter of Bella Sky, LLC owner of F/V Bella Sky
Plaintiff: Philip Bardales
Counter Defendant: Bella Sky, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11719
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Bella Sky, LLC.(Daly, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability and Claimant's Motion to Dismiss Petition filed by Bella Sky, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Claim Letters)(Daly, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 17 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jerry D. Hamilton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tyler J. Tanner. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
November 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tyler J. Tanner Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8502655 by Bella Sky, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Tyler J. Tanner)(Daly, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jerry D. Hamilton Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8502586 by Bella Sky, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Jerry D. Hamilton, Esq.)(Daly, Michael)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability and Claimant's Motion to Dismiss Petition by Philip Bardales.(Kelley, Walter)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Bella Sky, LLC by Philip Bardales.(Kelley, Walter)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Kelley on behalf of Philip Bardales (Kelley, Walter)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. AMENDED NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS OF COMPLAINT FOREXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY(Lyness, Paul)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time (Lyness, Paul)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to December 2, 2020 to Extend claim filing date by Bella Sky, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability)(Daly, Michael)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. Monition and Injunction(Lyness, Paul)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER Entered.Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability(Lyness, Paul)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: Order Approving Petitioners Letter of Undertaking and Directing Issuance of Monition and Injunction entered(Lyness, Paul)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion (Lyness, Paul)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION For entry of Order Approving Letter of Undertaking and Directing Issuance of Monition and Injunction by Bella Sky, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration, #3 Exhibit Proposed Monition and Injunction)(Daly, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bella Sky, LLC. (Daly, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8424014 Fee status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bella Sky, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(McDonagh, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the matter of Bella Sky, LLC owner of F/V Bella Sky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bella Sky, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Daly
Represented By: Tyler J. Tanner
Represented By: Jerry D. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Bardales
Represented By: Walter Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?