Reese v. Structures Derek Inc.
Plaintiff: Caron Reese
Defendant: Structures Derek Inc. and Jacques Brochu
Case Number: 1:2020cv11723
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Caron Reese (Long, Mickey)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension for Additional Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant's answer to complaint due by 11/13/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/13/2020 to Respond to Complaint by Jacques Brochu, Structures Derek Inc..(Deluhery, Megan)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Halley, Taylor)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8424847 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Structures Derek Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Sheet)(Deluhery, Megan) Modified on 9/22/2020 (Montes, Mariliz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Structures Derek Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caron Reese
Represented By: Mickey Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structures Derek Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Deluhery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacques Brochu
Represented By: Megan C. Deluhery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?