Hometown America Management, LLC et al v. Town of Middleborough et al
Plaintiff: Hometown Oak Point I, LLC, Hometown Oakpoint II, LLC, Hometown America Management, LLC and Hometown America, LLC
Defendant: Neil Rosenthal, Mark Germain, Leilani Dalpe, Arthur Battistini, Board of Health of the Town of Middleborough, Massachusetts, Town of Middleborough, Board of Selectmen of the Town of Middleborough and Nathan Demers
Case Number: 1:2020cv11749
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite , Second MOTION for Extension of Time to February 1, 2021 to File Answer , Second MOTION for Extension of Time to February 1, 2021 to File Answer by Arthur Battistini, Board of Health of the Town of Middleborough, Massachusetts, Board of Selectmen of the Town of Middleborough, Leilani Dalpe, Nathan Demers, Mark Germain, Neil Rosenthal, Town of Middleborough.(Corbo, Gregg)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Studley Knowles on behalf of Hometown America Management, LLC, Hometown America, LLC, Hometown Oak Point I, LLC, Hometown Oakpoint II, LLC (Knowles, Andrea)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tristan P. Colangelo on behalf of Hometown America Management, LLC, Hometown America, LLC, Hometown Oak Point I, LLC, Hometown Oakpoint II, LLC (Colangelo, Tristan)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Town of Middleborough answer due 11/23/2020. (Simeone, Maria)
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 23, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Town of Middleborough.(Corbo, Gregg)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants. (Colangelo, Tristan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 12/24/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8434295 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Hometown America Management, LLC, Hometown America, LLC, Hometown Oak Point I, LLC, Hometown Oakpoint II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Sheet)(Goodheart, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hometown America Management, LLC et al v. Town of Middleborough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Rosenthal
Represented By: Gregg J. Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Germain
Represented By: Gregg J. Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leilani Dalpe
Represented By: Gregg J. Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Battistini
Represented By: Gregg J. Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Health of the Town of Middleborough, Massachusetts
Represented By: Gregg J. Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Middleborough
Represented By: Gregg J. Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Selectmen of the Town of Middleborough
Represented By: Gregg J. Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Demers
Represented By: Gregg J. Corbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hometown Oak Point I, LLC
Represented By: Lisa C. Goodheart
Represented By: Andrea Studley Knowles
Represented By: Tristan P. Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hometown Oakpoint II, LLC
Represented By: Lisa C. Goodheart
Represented By: Andrea Studley Knowles
Represented By: Tristan P. Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hometown America Management, LLC
Represented By: Lisa C. Goodheart
Represented By: Andrea Studley Knowles
Represented By: Tristan P. Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hometown America, LLC
Represented By: Lisa C. Goodheart
Represented By: Andrea Studley Knowles
Represented By: Tristan P. Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?