Lawyers for Civil Rights v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Lawyers for Civil Rights
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv11777
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER granting #9 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading until 12/4/2020. (Beatty, Barbara)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 4, 2020 to File Answer by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Brizius, Erin)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Brizius, Erin)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawyers for Civil Rights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPS USCIS Info, #2 Exhibit C - USPS Attorney General Info)(Manganaro, Kevin)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Lawyers for Civil Rights. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/5/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - USPS US Attorney Info)(Manganaro, Kevin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa I. Delinks on behalf of Lawyers for Civil Rights (Delinks, Marissa)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Sampson on behalf of Lawyers for Civil Rights (Sampson, Lauren)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8439274 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lawyers for Civil Rights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Draft Regulation, #2 Exhibit B - FOIA Request, #3 Exhibit C - Automatic Reply, #4 Exhibit D - Acknowledgment Email, #5 Exhibit E - Emails, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Form)(Manganaro, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawyers for Civil Rights v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawyers for Civil Rights
Represented By: Kevin W. Manganaro
Represented By: Marissa I. Delinks
Represented By: Lauren A. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?