Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Andrew R. Wheeler, William Barr, Jeffrey Clark, United States Environmental Protection Agency and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2020cv11827
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Rufus Justin Smith on behalf of United States Department of Justice, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler (Smith, Rufus)
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion to Establish Briefing Schedule. (Folan, Karen)
December 2, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Establish Briefing Schedule by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc..(Annatoyn, Travis)
November 24, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by William Barr, Jeffrey Clark, United States Department of Justice, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Kendrick, Hunter)
November 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter J. Kendrick on behalf of United States Department of Justice, United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler (Kendrick, Hunter)
October 27, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Annatoyn, Travis)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jeffrey Clark served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Annatoyn, Travis)
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew R. Wheeler served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Annatoyn, Travis)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 10/21/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Annatoyn, Travis)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed United States Department of Justice served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Annatoyn, Travis)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed William Barr served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. (Annatoyn, Travis)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sean Lev. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Robin Thurston. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael Martinez. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Travis Annatoyn. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sean Lev Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8462174 by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Govern, Heather)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robin Thurston Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8462164 by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Govern, Heather)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Martinez Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8462122 by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Govern, Heather)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Travis Annatoyn Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8461959 by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Govern, Heather)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8454801 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Govern, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R. Wheeler
Represented By: Rufus Justin Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Hunter J. Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Clark
Represented By: Hunter J. Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Rufus Justin Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Rufus Justin Smith
Represented By: Hunter J. Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Heather A. Govern
Represented By: Sean Lev
Represented By: Michael Martinez
Represented By: Robin Thurston
Represented By: Travis J. Annatoyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?