Coravin, Inc. v. Double Deals et al
Plaintiff: Coravin, Inc.
Defendant: Tzvi Ginsberg, John Does 1-100 and Double Deals
Case Number: 1:2020cv11893
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Coravin, Inc. (Chafe, Marie)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. 30 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL and closing order entered. (Simeone, Maria)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE: Counsel have reported that this case has settled. A 30 day settlement order of dismissal will enter and this case will be closed. (Simeone, Maria)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Coravin, Inc.. Double Deals served on 10/23/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Coravin, Inc.. (Chafe, Marie)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Coravin, Inc.. Tzvi Ginsberg served on 10/23/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Coravin, Inc.. (Chafe, Marie)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 1/19/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Chafe, Marie)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Injunctive, and Other Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8472554 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Coravin, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Chafe, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coravin, Inc. v. Double Deals et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tzvi Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double Deals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coravin, Inc.
Represented By: Marie E. Chafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?