Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Smith
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: William Smith, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11945
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference, to be held by telephone, set for 1/21/2021 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey M. Zielinski. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; ALLOWING #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thaddeus S. Kirk. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thaddeus S. Kirk Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8551054 by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Cohn, Jason)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey M. Zielinski Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8551053 by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Cohn, Jason)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by William Smith, Jr.(Gleavy, John)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet (CategoryForm4-411) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Cohn, Jason)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Smith, Jr. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Group for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.. (Cohn, Jason)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Smith, Jr Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8486286 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohn, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason E. Cohn
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Zielinski
Represented By: Thaddeus S. Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Smith, Jr.
Represented By: John F Gleavy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?