Pensamiento Chacon et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Francisco Pensamiento Chacon and Yaritza Guadalupe Moreno
Defendant: William W. Popp, Daniel Fennell, Carl C. Risch, William P. Barr, Chad F. Wolf and Secretary of State Michael R. Pompeo
Case Number: 1:2020cv12058
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of William P. Barr, Daniel Fennell, Michael R. Pompeo, William W. Popp, Carl C. Risch, Chad F. Wolf (Kanwit, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Samuel Francisco Pensamiento Chacon, Yaritza Guadalupe Moreno. William W. Popp served on 11/27/2020, answer due 1/26/2021. (DeVoogd, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Samuel Francisco Pensamiento Chacon, Yaritza Guadalupe Moreno. Michael R. Pompeo served on 11/27/2020, answer due 1/26/2021. (DeVoogd, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Samuel Francisco Pensamiento Chacon, Yaritza Guadalupe Moreno. Daniel Fennell served on 11/27/2020, answer due 1/26/2021. (DeVoogd, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Samuel Francisco Pensamiento Chacon, Yaritza Guadalupe Moreno. Chad F. Wolf served on 11/27/2020, answer due 1/26/2021. (DeVoogd, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Samuel Francisco Pensamiento Chacon, Yaritza Guadalupe Moreno. Carl C. Risch served on 11/27/2020, answer due 1/26/2021. (DeVoogd, Andrew)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Francisco Pensamiento Chacon, Yaritza Guadalupe Moreno. (DeVoogd, Andrew)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Pacho, Arnold)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Seeking to Compel the Adjudication of Immigrant Visa Application against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8517048 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Yaritza Guadalupe Moreno, Samuel Francisco Pensamiento Chacon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Category Sheet)(DeVoogd, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pensamiento Chacon et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Francisco Pensamiento Chacon
Represented By: Andrew H. DeVoogd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaritza Guadalupe Moreno
Represented By: Andrew H. DeVoogd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Popp
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Fennell
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl C. Risch
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Michael R. Pompeo
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?