Epson America, Inc. v. Goodee et al
Plaintiff: Epson America, Inc.
Defendant: Bomaker, WiMiUS and Goodee
Case Number: 1:2020cv12102
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 20 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Bomaker answer due 2/1/2021; Goodee answer due 2/1/2021. (Urso, Lisa)
January 15, 2021 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 2/1/2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint for Defendants Bomaker and Goodee by Epson America, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
January 5, 2021 Filing 18 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint WiMiUS answer due 1/22/2021. (Urso, Lisa)
December 28, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/23/2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint for Defendant WiMiUS by Epson America, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
December 28, 2020 Filing 16 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Bomaker answer due 1/19/2021; Goodee answer due 1/19/2021.; granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Bomaker answer due 1/19/2021; Goodee answer due 1/19/2021. (Urso, Lisa)
December 28, 2020 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/18/2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint for Defendant Bomaker by Epson America, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Epson America, Inc.. Bomaker served on 12/8/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Epson America, Inc.. (Nickerson, Morgan)
December 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard A. Flanagan on behalf of Goodee (Flanagan, Bernard)
December 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan D. Rose, Sr on behalf of Goodee (Rose, Alan)
December 18, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/18/2021 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint for Defendant Goodee by Epson America, Inc..(Nickerson, Morgan)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for alternative service of process (Urso, Lisa)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS on Defendant Bomaker by Epson America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Attempted Service, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Order, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Order, #4 Exhibit D- State Court Order)(Nickerson, Morgan)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Epson America, Inc.. WiMiUS served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Epson America, Inc.. (Nickerson, Morgan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for alternative service of process (Urso, Lisa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION ALTERNATIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS AS TO DEFENDANT WIMIUS by Epson America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Order, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Order, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Order)(Nickerson, Morgan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Epson America, Inc.. Goodee served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Epson America, Inc.. (Nickerson, Morgan)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark AO 120. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case. (Vieira, Leonardo)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bomaker, WiMiUS, Goodee Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8523999 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Epson America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Nickerson, Morgan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epson America, Inc. v. Goodee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bomaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WiMiUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodee
Represented By: Bernard A. Flanagan
Represented By: Alan D. Rose, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epson America, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan T. Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?