Winkler Law LLC v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Winkler Law LLC
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2020cv12125
Filed: November 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by Winkler Law LLC. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs served on 11/30/2020, answer due 1/29/2021. (Winkler, Susan)
November 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Finn, Mary)
November 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
November 26, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED Summons (Draft attached) by Winkler Law LLC. (Winkler, Susan) Modified on 11/27/2020 to correct the text to reflect the document that is being filed. (Finn, Mary).
November 26, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Winkler Law LLC. (Winkler, Susan)
November 26, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Winkler Law LLC. (Winkler, Susan)
November 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs by Winkler Law LLC against Winkler Law LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8528256 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Winkler Law LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Winkler, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkler Law LLC v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winkler Law LLC
Represented By: Susan G. Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?