Moran et al v. Commonwealth of Massachusetts et al
Plaintiff: Ingrid Centurion, Helen Brady, Craig Valdez, John Paul Moran and Caroline Colarusso
Defendant: William F. Galvin, Charles D. Baker, Jr. and Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Case Number: 1:2020cv12171
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Hession, Gregory)
December 29, 2020 Filing 19 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Charles D. Baker, Jr answer due 1/28/2021; Commonwealth of Massachusetts answer due 1/28/2021; William F. Galvin answer due 1/28/2021. (Folan, Karen)
December 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/28/2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Charles D. Baker, Jr, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, William F. Galvin.(Hornstine, Adam)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Helen Brady ONLY filed by Helen Brady (McDonagh, Christina)
December 16, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction originally set for 12/17/20 at 10:30 a.m. (Folan, Karen)
December 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Helen Brady, Ingrid Centurion, Caroline Colarusso, John Paul Moran, Craig Valdez to Withdraw Hearing on Preliminary Injunction (Hession, Gregory)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A. Hession on behalf of Helen Brady, Ingrid Centurion, Caroline Colarusso, John Paul Moran, Craig Valdez (Hession, Gregory)
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF by Charles D. Baker, Jr, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, William F. Galvin to #1 Complaint, Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Michelle K. Tassinari))(Hornstine, Adam)
December 15, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Charles D. Baker, Jr, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, William F. Galvin.(Hornstine, Adam)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 12/8/2020, Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 12/15/2020. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 10:30 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Pro se plaintiffs, Hornstine, Sterman) (Folan, Karen)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne L. Sterman on behalf of Charles D. Baker, Jr, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, William F. Galvin (Sterman, Anne)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Hornstine on behalf of Charles D. Baker, Jr, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, William F. Galvin (Hornstine, Adam)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference set for 12/8/2020 02:30 PM by Telephone Conference before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Note this is a TIME CHANGE ONLY(McDonagh, Christina)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties are to appear before the Court for a status conference to discuss Plaintiffs emergency motion for a preliminary injunction on 12/8/2020 at 02:00 PM by teleconference. Plaintiffs shall serve Defendants with a copy of this Order. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 1BST082721 for #1 Complaint, (Barbosa, Nilsa)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Emergency Motion For Preliminary Injunction against All Defendants, filed by Helen Brady, Ingrid Centurion, Caroline Colarusso, John Paul Moran, Craig Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Form, #9 Notice of Civil Action) (Kelly, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran et al v. Commonwealth of Massachusetts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Centurion
Represented By: Gregory A. Hession
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Brady
Represented By: Gregory A. Hession
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Valdez
Represented By: Gregory A. Hession
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Moran
Represented By: Gregory A. Hession
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Colarusso
Represented By: Gregory A. Hession
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Galvin
Represented By: Adam Hornstine
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Hornstine
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Adam Hornstine
Represented By: Anne L. Sterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?