Jeannite v. AutoZone Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Joel Jeannite
Defendant: Amani Woods, Angel Cruz and AutoZone Inc.,
Case Number: 1:2020cv12202
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AutoZone Inc.,. (Storm, Christopher)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Storm, Christopher)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by AutoZone Inc.,, Angel Cruz, Amani Woods. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet)(Storm, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) and (5) : Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2021 at 2:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) and (5) filed by AutoZone Inc.,, Angel Cruz, Amani Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Storm, Christopher)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(4) and (5) by AutoZone Inc.,, Angel Cruz, Amani Woods.(Storm, Christopher)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by AutoZone Inc.,. (Storm, Christopher)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean F. McDonough on behalf of AutoZone Inc., (McDonough, Sean)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Storm on behalf of AutoZone Inc., (Storm, Christopher)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AutoZone Inc., ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8549711 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Storm, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeannite v. AutoZone Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amani Woods
Represented By: Christopher C. Storm
Represented By: Sean F. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Cruz
Represented By: Christopher C. Storm
Represented By: Sean F. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Inc.,
Represented By: Christopher C. Storm
Represented By: Sean F. McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Jeannite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?