Norris v. Alves
Petitioner: James Norris
Respondent: Nelson Alves
Case Number: 1:2020cv12234
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Petitioner shall file a memorandum of law in support of his petition no later than March 31, 2021. The Respondent's memorandum of law in opposition shall be filed within 60 days of the filing of Petitioners memorandum or, if no such memorandum is filed, within 60 days after the expiration of Petitioners time to do so. Petitioners reply, if any, will be due within 30 days of the filing of Respondents memorandum of law in opposition.(Halley, Taylor)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: docket entry 11 corrected because: entered in error please disregard. (Halley, Taylor)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (Halley, Taylor)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Order to schedule by Nelson Alves.(Badway, Eva) Modified on 2/10/2021 (Halley, Taylor).
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Nelson Alves Regarding Existence of Victim (Badway, Eva)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE/ANSWER to petition for a writ of habeas corpus by Nelson Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State court documents, #2 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #3 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #4 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #5 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #6 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #7 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #8 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #9 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #10 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #11 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #12 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #13 Exhibit State court trial transcript, #14 Exhibit State court trial transcript)(Badway, Eva) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/9/2021) (Halley, Taylor).
January 12, 2021 Filing 7 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST083161 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Barbosa, Nilsa)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time granted to 2/9/2021. (Bono, Christine)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 9, 2021 to file an answer or otherwise plead by Nelson Alves.(Badway, Eva)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva M. Badway on behalf of Nelson Alves (Badway, Eva)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (Halley, Taylor)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by Nelson Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 cover letter, #3 envelope)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris v. Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nelson Alves
Represented By: Eva M. Badway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?