Findability Sciences, Inc. v. Soft10, Inc.
Plaintiff: Findability Sciences, Inc.
Defendant: Soft10, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv12236
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 Judge Denise J. Casper: Standing Order Regarding Appearance of Counsel Via Telephone or Videoconference(Hourihan, Lisa)
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa)
February 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2021 01:45 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Denise J. Casper.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the sessions courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Courts general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Findability Sciences, Inc. by Soft10, Inc..(Cornell, Timothy)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Soft10, Inc. answer due 1/29/2021. (Hourihan, Lisa)
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to January 31, 2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Soft10, Inc..(Cornell, Timothy)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah W. Miller on behalf of Findability Sciences, Inc. (Miller, Micah)
December 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Dolan on behalf of Soft10, Inc. (Dolan, Patrick)
December 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M. Cornell on behalf of Soft10, Inc. (Cornell, Timothy)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Repicky, Heather)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Copyright AO 121. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms/Local Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing of copyright case. (Finn, Mary)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Soft10, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Finn, Mary)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Findability Sciences, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Softbank Corp. for Findability Sciences, Inc... (Repicky, Heather)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Soft10, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8557916 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Findability Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Repicky, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Findability Sciences, Inc. v. Soft10, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft10, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Dolan
Represented By: Timothy M. Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Findability Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Heather B. Repicky
Represented By: Micah W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?