National Consumer Law Center v. Saul
Plaintiff: National Consumer Law Center
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv12253
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Andrew M. Saul answer due 3/15/2021. (Loret, Magdalena)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 15, 2021 to File Answer by Andrew M. Saul.(Weida, Jason)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Weida on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Weida, Jason)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 3/18/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8559736 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by National Consumer Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Rossman, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Consumer Law Center v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Consumer Law Center
Represented By: Stuart T. Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jason C. Weida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?