Benner v. Demoura et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Benner
Defendant: Mary Ellen Dolen, Douglas H. Demoura, Several Other Defendants, Jenny Sierra, Dr. Ay Hameed, Mary Dolan, Jenny Viera, Joanne Stachowicz, G. Sueldo Guevara and Her B. Ddungo
Case Number: 1:2020cv12269
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 1BST083757 for #9 Amended Complaint (Barbosa, Nilsa)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Her B. Ddungo, Mary Dolan, Joanne Stachowicz, Douglas H. Demoura, Jenny Viera, Ay Hameed, filed by Kevin Benner. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint - Part II)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered 1.Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to pay the filing fee is granted. Within 42 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, plaintiff either shall (1) pay the $402.00 filing and administrative fees; or (2) file an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. Failure of the plaintiff to comply with this directive may result in the dismissal of this action. 2.Plaintiff's original complaint and amended complaint are subject to dismissal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. If Benner wishes to proceed, within 42 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, he shall file a second amended complaint which cures the pleading deficiencies of the original and amended complaints and setting forth cognizable claims in accordance with Rules 8 and 10 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (setting forth the name of each defendant, the separate cause of action/legal theory asserted against each defendant, a concise statement of the underlying factual basis supporting each cause of action, and relief sought). The clerk shall send plaintiff a blank complaint form, a step-by-step guide to filing a civil action, and courtesy copies of the complaint and amended complaint. 3.No summonses shall issue pending further order of this court. Failure to timely comply with these directives may subject this action to dismissal. (PSSA, 4)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 COPIES re #1 Complaint and #5 Amended Complaint, 3 Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge-MAILED TO: Kevin Benner #W114235 MCI - Cedar Junction at Walpole PO Box 100 Route 1A South Walpole, MA 02071.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Letter/Request and MOTION for Extension of Time regarding filing fees by Kevin Benner.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kevin Benner.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: PROCEDURAL ORDER entered. Within 35 days of this Procedural Order, plaintiff either shall (1) pay the $402.00 filing and administrative fees; or (2) file an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. Failure of the plaintiff to comply with this directive may result in the dismissal of this action. The Clerk shall provide plaintiff with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and a courtesy copy of the complaint.(PSSA, 4)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 Letter/request (non-motion) from Kevin Benner. (Castilla, Francis)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevin Benner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis) (Additional attachment(s) #4 Supplement) (Castilla, Francis).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benner v. Demoura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ellen Dolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas H. Demoura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Several Other Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Sierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ay Hameed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Viera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Stachowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Sueldo Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Her B. Ddungo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?