Dacosta v. Rodrigues
Petitioner: Hailton Dacosta
Respondent: Michael Rodrigues
Case Number: 1:2021cv10024
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 3/15/21. (Hourihan, Lisa)
February 8, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 Copy re 10 Order on Motion for Order - MAILED TO: Hailton Dacosta MCI - Shirley PO Box 1218 Shirley, MA 01464 on 2/1/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Allowed #8 Motion or Order to Relieve the parties of the conference requirement in Rule 7.1. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 15, 2021 to File Answer by Michael Rodrigues.(Johnston, Tara)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to Relieve the parties of the conference requirement in Rule 7.1 by Michael Rodrigues.(Johnston, Tara)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lyn Johnston on behalf of Michael Rodrigues (Johnston, Tara)
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 Copy re #4 Service Order - 2254 Petition and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge - MAILED TO: Hailton Dacosta MCI - Shirley PO Box 1218 Shirley, MA 01464 this date. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST083102 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Barbosa, Nilsa)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Hailton Dacosta. (Castilla, Francis)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by Hailton Dacosta.(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dacosta v. Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hailton Dacosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Rodrigues
Represented By: Tara Lyn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?