Paulsen v. Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Susan Paulsen
Defendant: Leo Bissonnette, Stewart Property Management and Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership
Case Number: 1:2021cv10121
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Haverty on behalf of Leo Bissonnette (Haverty, John)
March 19, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Haverty on behalf of Stewart Property Management (Haverty, John)
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership.(Marlin, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2021 Filing 14 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership answer due 3/12/2021. (McDonagh, Christina)
February 22, 2021 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3-12-21 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership.(Marlin, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Marlin on behalf of Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership (Marlin, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership answer due 2/26/2021. (Vieira, Leonardo)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 26, 2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership.(Stanley, Michael)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Kayes, Thomas)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Leo Bissonnette served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Kayes, Thomas)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Susan Paulsen. Stewart Property Management waiver sent on 1/28/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Kayes, Thomas)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Stanley on behalf of Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership (Stanley, Michael)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thomas R. Kayes. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas R. Kayes Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8605739 by Susan Paulsen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Walsh, William)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Leo Bissonnette, Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership, Stewart Property Management. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8604371 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Susan Paulsen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Walsh, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paulsen v. Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Paulsen
Represented By: William L. Walsh
Represented By: Thomas R. Kayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Bissonnette
Represented By: John W. Haverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Property Management
Represented By: John W. Haverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Bridge Attleboro Limited Partnership
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Marlin
Represented By: Michael R. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?