Devine v Saul
Plaintiff: Zachary Devine
Defendant: SSA Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv10129
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Andrew M. Saul served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021. (Baker, Casey)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Castilla, Francis)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Notice re: service by US Marshal Service with copies of L.R. 4.1 and instructions for service on U.S. The USM-285 forms may be found at www.usmarshals.gov/process/usm285.pdf and are also available from the Clerk upon request.(PSSA, 4)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall issue summons for service of the defendant. Plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshals Service. If directed by plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshals shall serve the summons, complaint and this order upon defendant, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. Plaintiff shall have 90 days from the date of this Order to complete service.(PSSA, 4)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Zachary Devine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Landrigan, Richard) Modified on 2/3/2021 (Burgos, Sandra).
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zachary Devine.(Landrigan, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devine v Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Devine
Represented By: Richard F. Landrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?