Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp. v. The School Committee of the City of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.
Defendant: Quoc Tran, Jeri Robinson, Ernani DeAraujo, Hardin Coleman, Alexandra Oliver-Davila, The School Committee of the City of Boston, Michael O'Neil, Lorna Rivera and Brenda Cassellius
Interested Party: Anti-Defamation League and Massachusetts Law Reform Institute
Intervenor Defendant: Asian American Resource Workshop, H.D., Greater Boston Latino Network, The Boston Branch of the NAACP, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network and Maireny Pimentel
Amicus Curiae: Asian American Legal Foundation, Asian American Coalition for Education and Center for Law and Education, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10330
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 108 USCA Case Number 21-1303 for #106 Notice of Appeal, filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Paine, Matthew)
April 16, 2021 Filing 107 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #106 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
April 15, 2021 Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #104 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp. Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number 0101-8731227 Fee Status: Not Exempt. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 5/5/2021. (Stein, Callan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 105 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT (Paine, Matthew)
April 15, 2021 Filing 104 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. FINDINGS OF FACT, RULINGS OF LAW, AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
April 12, 2021 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Koch on behalf of Anti-Defamation League (Koch, Bryan)
April 9, 2021 Filing 102 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn)
April 9, 2021 Filing 101 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction (Case-Stated Hearing) held on April 6, 2021, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. Redaction Request due 4/30/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2021. (Coppola, Katelyn)
April 9, 2021 Filing 100 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction (Status Conference) held on March 16, 2021, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. Redaction Request due 4/30/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2021. (Coppola, Katelyn)
April 9, 2021 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by Center for Law and Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Amicus Curiae of Center For Law and Education in Support of Defendants and Defendants-Intervenors)(Boundy, Kathleen)
April 9, 2021 Filing 98 BRIEF by Brenda Cassellius, Hardin Coleman, Ernani DeAraujo, Michael O'Neil, Alexandra Oliver-Davila, Lorna Rivera, Jeri Robinson, The School Committee of the City of Boston, Quoc Tran (Defendants' Post-Hearing Memorandum). (Hodge, Kay)
April 9, 2021 Filing 97 BRIEF by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp. (Plaintiff's Post Hearing Brief). (Stein, Callan)
April 8, 2021 Filing 96 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Verified Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit F)(Stein, Callan)
April 8, 2021 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP to #72 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (Rachal, Doreen)
April 8, 2021 Filing 94 Response by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp. to #77 Proposed Findings of Fact (Conclusions of Law). (Stein, Callan)
April 8, 2021 Filing 93 Response by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp. to #77 Proposed Findings of Fact . (Stein, Callan)
April 7, 2021 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Clairmont on behalf of Greater Boston Latino Network, The Boston Branch of the NAACP (Clairmont, Amanda)
April 6, 2021 Filing 91 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #79 Motion to Amend #1 Complaint by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.; denying #81 Motion to Strike by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.; denying #84 Motion to Reserve Ten Minutes for Rebuttal by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 6, 2021 Filing 90 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Hearing held on 4/6/2021 by video. The Court finds and makes a ruling that the Boston Parent Coalition has organizational standing which moots the need for the evidentiary hearing scheduled for this date at 2:00 PM. An order enters granting motion to amend complaint; denying motion to strike and denying motion to reserve time for rebuttal. After hearing arguments of counsel, the Court takes the matter under advisement. A decision will not enter within 48 hours. Any post hearing briefs are welcomed but not required. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorney Hurd for the plaintiff; Attorney Hodge for the defendant and Attorney Rachal for the intervenors) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 6, 2021 Filing 89 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Robby L.R. Saldana. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
April 5, 2021 Filing 88 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Asian American Coalition for Education and Asian American Legal Foundation in Support of Plaintiff. (Fauth, Gordon)
April 5, 2021 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stein, Callan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 86 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #68 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae brief by Asian American Legal Foundation; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
April 5, 2021 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Support re #84 MOTION Reserve Ten Minutes for Rebuttal filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Stein, Callan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 84 MOTION Reserve Ten Minutes for Rebuttal by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp..(Stein, Callan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Judgment and Injunctive Relief) filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Stein, Callan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Support re #81 MOTION to Strike filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Stein, Callan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 81 MOTION to Strike by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp..(Stein, Callan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Support re #79 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Stein, Callan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp..(Stein, Callan)
April 5, 2021 Filing 78 STATEMENT of facts (Supplemental Statement of Agreed Upon Facts). (Stein, Callan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 77 Proposed Findings of Fact by All Defendants. (Hodge, Kay)
April 2, 2021 Filing 76 TRIAL BRIEF by All Defendants. (Hodge, Kay)
April 2, 2021 Filing 75 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Anti-Defamation League (Brief of Amici Curiae The Anti-Defamation League, Amplify Latinx, The Black Economic Council of Massachusetts, The Boston Bar Association, The Boston Celtics, The Boston Red Sox, The Jewish Alliance for Law and Social Action, King Boston, The Massachusetts Immigrant and Refugee Advocacy Coalition, The Massachusetts LGBT Chamber of Commerce, The Mental Health Legal Advisors Committee, The New Commonwealth Racial Equity and Social Justice Fund, and Rapid7 in Support of Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Addendum)(Gershenson, Adam)
April 2, 2021 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Asian American Coalition for Education. (Fauth, Gordon)
April 2, 2021 Filing 73 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Asian American Coalition for Education and Asian American Legal Foundation in Support of Plaintiff. (Fauth, Gordon)
April 2, 2021 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP. (Rachal, Doreen)
April 2, 2021 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Massachusetts Law Reform Institute. (Burke, Melanie)
April 2, 2021 Filing 70 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Massachusetts Law Reform Institute , LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Children's Law Center of Massachusetts, et al. in Support of Denial of Preliminary Injunction and Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Burke, Melanie)
April 2, 2021 Filing 69 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robby L.R. Saldana Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8709738 by Anti-Defamation League. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robby L.R. Saldana in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Gershenson, Adam)
April 1, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae brief by Asian American Legal Foundation.(Fauth, Gordon)
April 1, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon M. Fauth, Jr on behalf of Asian American Legal Foundation (Fauth, Gordon)
April 1, 2021 Filing 66 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #65 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Gordon M. Fauth, Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
March 31, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gordon M. Fauth, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8706215 by Asian American Legal Foundation, Asian American Coalition for Education. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Gordon M. Fauth, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Randazza, Marc)
March 24, 2021 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anti-Defamation League. (Gershenson, Adam)
March 23, 2021 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum 1 - Addendum 5)(Stein, Callan) Modified on 3/24/2021 to Correct Docket Text as Counsel Filed the Memorandum of Law in Support Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF (Paine, Matthew). Modified on 3/24/2021 to Correct Docket Text (Paine, Matthew).
March 23, 2021 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum 1 - Addendum 5)(Stein, Callan) Memorandum filed in Error - Please See ECF No. 63
March 23, 2021 Filing 61 Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
March 23, 2021 Filing 60 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #58 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Paine, Matthew)
March 22, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Francisca D. Fajana on behalf of Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (Fajana, Francisca)
March 22, 2021 Filing 58 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp..(Stein, Callan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 57 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #53 Motion for Extension of Time to 4/21/2021 to File Answer by Brenda Cassellius, Hardin Coleman, Ernani DeAraujo, Michael O'Neil, Alexandra Oliver-Davila, Lorna Rivera, Jeri Robinson, The School Committee of the City of Boston, Quoc Tran. The parties already-filed statement of agreed upon facts and exhibits shall serve as Defendants Answer to the Complaint as requested. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 22, 2021 Filing 56 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #52 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Massachusetts Law Reform Institute. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 22, 2021 Filing 55 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #42 Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief by Anti-Defamation League; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 19, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/21/2021 to File Answer by Brenda Cassellius, Hardin Coleman, Ernani DeAraujo, Michael O'Neil, Alexandra Oliver-Davila, Lorna Rivera, Jeri Robinson, The School Committee of the City of Boston, Quoc Tran.(Simon, John)
March 19, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Massachusetts Law Reform Institute.(Alosco, Brian)
March 19, 2021 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Massachusetts Law Reform Institute. (Alosco, Brian)
March 19, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda B. Varella on behalf of Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (Varella, Amanda)
March 19, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dahl Burke on behalf of Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (Burke, Melanie)
March 19, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Alosco on behalf of Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (Alosco, Brian)
March 19, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Benzan on behalf of Massachusetts Law Reform Institute (Benzan, Virginia)
March 16, 2021 Filing 54 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Status Conference held on 3/16/2021 by video. The Court sets briefing schedule: plaintiff's brief due on March 23, 2021; defendants'/intervenors brief due 4/2/2021. Oral arguments set for April 6, 2021 at 10:00 AM. The motion #42 for leave to file an Amicus Curiae Brief by Anti-Defamatioin League is allowed. Hearing set for 4/6/2021 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Attorneys Hurd, Stein, Carlson and Metcalfe for the plaintiff; Attorneys Hodge and Simon for the defendants; and Attorney Rachal on behalf of proposed intervenors) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 16, 2021 Filing 44 STATUS REPORT and Statement of Additional Materials Facts by Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Dorreen M. Rachal, #2 Exhibit 51)(Rachal, Doreen)
March 16, 2021 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #35 Declaration, #38 Appendix/Exhibit,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a paper courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office Attention Matthew Paine - Docket Clerk - Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew)
March 15, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn)
March 15, 2021 Filing 45 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction held on March 3, 2021, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com. Redaction Request due 4/5/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2021. (Coppola, Katelyn)
March 15, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief by Anti-Defamation League.(Gershenson, Adam)
March 15, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Gershenson on behalf of Anti-Defamation League (Gershenson, Adam)
March 15, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sheetz on behalf of Anti-Defamation League (Sheetz, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Filing 39 STATEMENT of facts (Plaintiff's Disputed). (Stein, Callan)
March 15, 2021 Filing 38 Joint Agreed Statement of Facts by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75)(Stein, Callan) Modified on 3/16/2021 (Paine, Matthew).
March 15, 2021 Filing 37 STATEMENT of facts (Joint Agreed). (Stein, Callan)
March 15, 2021 Filing 36 STATEMENT of facts Not Agreed To By Parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Simon, John)
March 15, 2021 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Doreen M. Rachal by Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50)(Rachal, Doreen)
March 15, 2021 Filing 34 STATUS REPORT and Statement of Additional Material Facts by Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP. (Rachal, Doreen)
March 12, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E. Martin on behalf of Greater Boston Latino Network, The Boston Branch of the NAACP (Martin, Laura)
March 12, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason L. Burrell-Delrosario on behalf of Greater Boston Latino Network, The Boston Branch of the NAACP (Burrell-Delrosario, Jason)
March 12, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathilda McGee-Tubb on behalf of Greater Boston Latino Network, The Boston Branch of the NAACP (McGee-Tubb, Mathilda)
March 12, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Finegan on behalf of Greater Boston Latino Network, The Boston Branch of the NAACP (Finegan, Susan)
March 4, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew A. Domina on behalf of Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP (Domina, Drew)
March 4, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Oren M. Sellstrom on behalf of Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP (Sellstrom, Oren)
March 3, 2021 Filing 27 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2021 by video re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp. The Court collapses the motion for preliminary injunction with trial on the merits. Counsel shall meet and confer to submit a report by 5:00 PM on Monday, March 15, 2021 indicating the stipulated facts and where any disputes remain. The Court sets a status conference for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 at 10:00 AM, no discovery to be done prior to this hearing. The proposed intervenors are granted permissive intervention at this time. Status Conference set for 3/16/2021 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.) (Attorneys present: Attorneys Hurd, Stein, Carlson and Metcalfe for the plaintiff; Attorneys Hodge and Simon for the defendants; and Attorney Rachal on behalf of proposed intervenors) (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 3, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander JB Milvae on behalf of Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP (Milvae, Alexander)
March 3, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Y. Li on behalf of Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP (Li, Bethany)
March 3, 2021 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to proceed pseudonymously filed by H.D.. (Rachal, Doreen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to proceed pseudonymously by H.D..(Rachal, Doreen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Sampson on behalf of Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP (Sampson, Lauren)
March 3, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Intervene filed by Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit G.1, #9 Exhibit H)(Rachal, Doreen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene by Asian American Resource Workshop, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Greater Boston Latino Network, H.D., Maireny Pimentel, The Boston Branch of the NAACP.(Rachal, Doreen)
March 2, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Doreen M. Rachal on behalf of The Boston Branch of the NAACP, Greater Boston Latino Network, Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network, Asian American Resource Workshop, Maireny Pimentel, H.D. (Rachal, Doreen)
March 2, 2021 Filing 18 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #13 Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction to 03/10/2021 by Brenda Cassellius, Hardin Coleman, Ernani DeAraujo, Michael O'Neil, Alexandra Oliver-Davila, Lorna Rivera, Jeri Robinson, The School Committee of the City of Boston, Quoc Tran. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
March 2, 2021 Filing 17 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added William H. Hurd, Christopher W. Carlson, and Mary Grace W. Metcalfe. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
March 2, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mary Grace W. Metcalfe Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8659269 by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stein, Callan)
March 2, 2021 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher W. Carlson, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8659268 by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stein, Callan)
March 2, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William H. Hurd Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8659267 by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stein, Callan)
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction to 03/10/2021 by Brenda Cassellius, Hardin Coleman, Ernani DeAraujo, Michael O'Neil, Alexandra Oliver-Davila, Lorna Rivera, Jeri Robinson, The School Committee of the City of Boston, Quoc Tran.(Simon, John)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Simon on behalf of Brenda Cassellius, Hardin Coleman, Ernani DeAraujo, Michael O'Neil, Alexandra Oliver-Davila, Lorna Rivera, Jeri Robinson, The School Committee of the City of Boston, Quoc Tran (Simon, John)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kay H. Hodge on behalf of Brenda Cassellius, Hardin Coleman, Ernani DeAraujo, Michael O'Neil, Alexandra Oliver-Davila, Lorna Rivera, Jeri Robinson, The School Committee of the City of Boston, Quoc Tran (Hodge, Kay)
February 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Lizotte on behalf of Brenda Cassellius, Hardin Coleman, Ernani DeAraujo, Michael O'Neil, Alexandra Oliver-Davila, Lorna Rivera, Jeri Robinson, The School Committee of the City of Boston, Quoc Tran (Lizotte, Catherine)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing (non-evidentiary) set for 3/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer) Modified on 2/26/2021 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Notice of Case Assignment 05 corrected because: Entry made in error due to incorrect Assignment Deck was chosen when assigned to DJ Stearns and MJ Kelley. Case to be assigned again. (Finn, Mary)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, Callan)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Stein, Callan)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, Callan)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8656142 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit D (Census data and affirmation), #3 Exhibit F (Declaration of Benato Cui), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Local Categoy Filing Form)(Stein, Callan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp. v. The School Committee of the City of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quoc Tran
Represented By: Catherine A. Lizotte
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Kay H. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeri Robinson
Represented By: Catherine A. Lizotte
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Kay H. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernani DeAraujo
Represented By: Catherine A. Lizotte
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Kay H. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardin Coleman
Represented By: Catherine A. Lizotte
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Kay H. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Oliver-Davila
Represented By: Catherine A. Lizotte
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Kay H. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The School Committee of the City of Boston
Represented By: Catherine A. Lizotte
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Kay H. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O'Neil
Represented By: Catherine A. Lizotte
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Kay H. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna Rivera
Represented By: Catherine A. Lizotte
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Kay H. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Cassellius
Represented By: Catherine A. Lizotte
Represented By: John M. Simon
Represented By: Kay H. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Parent Coalition for Academic Excellence Corp.
Represented By: Callan G. Stein
Represented By: Mary Grace W. Metcalfe
Represented By: William H. Hurd
Represented By: Christopher W. Carlson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Anti-Defamation League
Represented By: Robby L.R. Saldana
Represented By: Michael Sheetz
Represented By: Adam S. Gershenson
Represented By: Bryan Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Massachusetts Law Reform Institute
Represented By: Francisca D. Fajana
Represented By: Melanie Dahl Burke
Represented By: Virginia Benzan
Represented By: Brian Alosco
Represented By: Amanda B. Varella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Asian American Resource Workshop
Represented By: Bethany Y. Li
Represented By: Doreen M. Rachal
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Drew A. Domina
Represented By: Alexander JB Milvae
Represented By: Lauren A. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: H.D.
Represented By: Bethany Y. Li
Represented By: Doreen M. Rachal
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Drew A. Domina
Represented By: Alexander JB Milvae
Represented By: Lauren A. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Greater Boston Latino Network
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Jason L. Burrell-Delrosario
Represented By: Bethany Y. Li
Represented By: Doreen M. Rachal
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Amanda Clairmont
Represented By: Drew A. Domina
Represented By: Alexander JB Milvae
Represented By: Mathilda McGee-Tubb
Represented By: Laura E. Martin
Represented By: Lauren A. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: The Boston Branch of the NAACP
Represented By: Susan M. Finegan
Represented By: Jason L. Burrell-Delrosario
Represented By: Bethany Y. Li
Represented By: Doreen M. Rachal
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Amanda Clairmont
Represented By: Drew A. Domina
Represented By: Alexander JB Milvae
Represented By: Mathilda McGee-Tubb
Represented By: Laura E. Martin
Represented By: Lauren A. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Asian Pacific Islander Civic Action Network
Represented By: Bethany Y. Li
Represented By: Doreen M. Rachal
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Drew A. Domina
Represented By: Alexander JB Milvae
Represented By: Lauren A. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Maireny Pimentel
Represented By: Bethany Y. Li
Represented By: Doreen M. Rachal
Represented By: Oren M. Sellstrom
Represented By: Drew A. Domina
Represented By: Alexander JB Milvae
Represented By: Lauren A. Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian American Legal Foundation
Represented By: Gordon M. Fauth, Jr.
Represented By: Marc J. Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian American Coalition for Education
Represented By: Gordon M. Fauth, Jr.
Represented By: Marc J. Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Center for Law and Education, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen B. Boundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?