Monestime et al v. Connelly, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Wold Monestime, Soane Monestime and O.G.M
Defendant: United States of America and Megan S. Connelly, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10403
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Referral to the Superior Court Department of the Trial Court of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts for the Convening of a Medical Malpractice Tribunal Pursuant to M.G.L.Ch. 231 § 60B . by Megan S. Connelly, M.D..(Luvisi, Tracy) Modified on 5/6/2021: Corrected event type and docket text to properly reflect filing (Kelly, Danielle).
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #5 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Megan S. Connelly, M.D..(Luvisi, Tracy)
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Marie Marcin on behalf of Megan S. Connelly, M.D. (Marcin, Donna)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy A. Luvisi on behalf of Megan S. Connelly, M.D. (Luvisi, Tracy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Soane Monestime, O.G.M, Wold Monestime. United States of America served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Soane Monestime; O.G.M; Wold Monestime. (Wickenheiser, Kathryn)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Soane Monestime, O.G.M, Wold Monestime. Megan S. Connelly, M.D. served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Soane Monestime; O.G.M; Wold Monestime. (Wickenheiser, Kathryn)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT , Redacted Per Court Order dated March 10, 2012 against Megan S. Connelly, M.D., United States of America Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8675807 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Soane Monestime, Wold Monestime, O.G.M.(Wickenheiser, Kathryn)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) requires in relevant part that "[u]nless the court orders otherwise, in an electronic or paper filing with the court that contains... the name of an individual known to be a minor,... a party or nonparty making the filing may include only:... the minors initials.... " The Complaint #1 contains the minor Plaintiff's full name and has been placed under seal. Plaintiffs' counsel shall promptly file a redacted version of the Complaint that replaces the minor's full name with the minor's initials. Unless otherwise ordered, all parties are directed to use the minor's initials in place of the minor's full name in all further filings with the court.Rule 5.2(a) also prohibits filings that contain an individual's birthdate, absent court order. Here, the Complaint includes the birthdate. As that date is material, however, the court orders that the birthdate may be filed on the public docket. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with copies of the redacted complaint, the sealed unredacted complaint, and this order. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Megan S. Connelly, M.D., United States of America. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Megan S. Connelly, M.D., United States of America Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8670882 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by O.G.M , Soane Monestime, Wold Monestime. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Wickenheiser, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monestime et al v. Connelly, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan S. Connelly, M.D.
Represented By: Tracy A. Luvisi
Represented By: Donna Marie Marcin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wold Monestime
Represented By: Kathryn J. Wickenheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soane Monestime
Represented By: Kathryn J. Wickenheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.G.M
Represented By: Kathryn J. Wickenheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?