Don v. Alves
Petitioner: Amos Don
Respondent: Superintendent Nelson B Alves
Case Number: 1:2021cv10468
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Amos Don. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Wood, Chauncey)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amos Don. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Wood, Chauncey)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court orders the following briefing schedule in this matter: (1) Petitioner shall file a memorandum of law in support of his petition by July 12, 2021; and (2) Respondent shall file a memorandum of law in opposition no more than sixty (60) days after Petitioner files his memorandum. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE/ANSWER to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Nelson B Alves. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Transcript of Motion Hearing -- dated March 12, 2013, #2 Exhibit 2. Transcript of Jury Trial Day 1, dated March 13, 2013, #3 Exhibit 3. Transcript of Jury Trial Day 2, dated March 14, 2013, #4 Exhibit 4. Transcript of Jury Trial Day 3, dated March 15, 2013, #5 Exhibit 5. Transcript of Jury Trial Day 4, dated March 18, 2013, #6 Exhibit 6. Transcript of Jury Trial Day 5, dated March 20, 2013, #7 Exhibit 7. Transcript of Jury Trial -- Day 6, dated March 21, 2013, #8 Exhibit 8. Transcript of Jury Trial -- Day 7, dated March 22, 2013, #9 Exhibit 9. Transcript of Jury Trial -- Day 8, dated March 25, 2013, #10 Exhibit 10. Transcript of Jury Trial -- day 9, dated March 26, 2013, #11 Exhibit 11. Transcript of Sentencing -- dated March 27, 2013)(Lumelsky, Anna)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE/ANSWER to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Nelson B Alves. (Lumelsky, Anna)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Folan, Karen)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 13, 2021 to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Nelson B Alves.(Lumelsky, Anna)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Nelson B Alves -- Statement Regarding Existence of Victims (Lumelsky, Anna)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna E. Lumelsky on behalf of Nelson B Alves (Lumelsky, Anna)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8686417 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Amos Don. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Addendum to Petition, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Wood, Chauncey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Don v. Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent Nelson B Alves
Represented By: Anna E. Lumelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amos Don
Represented By: Chauncey B. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?