Perez v. Licon-Vitale et al
Plaintiff: Marco Perez
Defendant: Julie Fabregas-Schindler, M. Licon-Vitale and Patricia Ruze
Case Number: 1:2021cv10607
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Csae reassigned to MJ Kelley due to being I believe related to 20-10930-MPK) (Finn, Mary)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Julie Fabregas-Schindler, M. Licon-Vitale, Marco Perez, Patricia Ruze. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Kelly, Danielle)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 Filing fee/payment: $ 402.00, receipt number 1BST084627 for #1 Complaint (Barbosa, Nilsa)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of Julie Fabregas-Schindler, M. Licon-Vitale, Patricia Ruze (Kanwit, Thomas)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: this case appears to be related to Marco Perez v. M. Licon-Vitale, 20-cv-10930-MPK. See Local Rule 40.1(d)(1). Accordingly, if all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kelley. The court requests that the parties notify the court whether they consent to the assignment of this case to Magistrate Judge Kelley. The Clerk shall provide Petitioner Perez and AUSA Kanwit with the Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form. While consent to the assignment of the case to the magistrate judge is entirely voluntary, and no adverse substantive consequences of any kind will redound to an attorney or party refusing consent, each party must submit the form indicating their consent or refuse to consent within twenty-eight days of the date of this Order. (Kelly, Danielle) Modified on 4/13/2021: corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle).
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 Docket Sheet, 3 copies of #4 Summons Issued, a copy of Rule 4, #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction mailed to Marco Perez on 4/13/2021. (Baker, Casey)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Julie Fabregas-Schindler, M. Licon-Vitale, Patricia Ruze. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Injunction by Marco Perez.(Baker, Casey)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Julie Fabregas-Schindler, Patricia Ruze, M. Licon-Vitale, filed by Marco Perez. (Attachments: #1 Additional Complaint ) (Baker, Casey) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/13/2021 - removed blank pages) (Kelly, Danielle). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/19/2021) (Kelly, Danielle). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2021: #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit 1, #13 Exhibit 2, #14 Exhibit 3, #15 Exhibit 4, #16 Exhibit 5, #17 Exhibit 6, #18 Exhibit 7, #19 Exhibit 8, #20 Exhibit 9, #21 Exhibit 10, #22 Exhibit 11, #23 Exhibit 12, #24 Exhibit 13, #25 Exhibit 14, #26 Exhibit 15, #27 Exhibit 16, #28 Exhibit 17, #29 Exhibit 18) (Kelly, Danielle). Modified on 4/19/2021: Separated exhibits and filed as separate attachments (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Licon-Vitale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Fabregas-Schindler
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Licon-Vitale
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ruze
Represented By: Thomas E. Kanwit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?