O'Brien v. Lowell General Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Brad O'Brien
Defendant: Fernando Roca, M.D., Lowell General Hospital, Rebecca Gabryjelski, R.N., Lucia Modesti, M.D., Melanie Rodriguez, R.N. and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv10621
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply by United States of America.(Brizius, Erin)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by United States of America of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brizius, Erin)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brad O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Satin, Adam)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by United States of America of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brizius, Erin)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Satin on behalf of Brad O'Brien (Satin, Adam)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United States of America. (Brizius, Erin)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 5/17/2021) by United States of America.(Brizius, Erin)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered: Please see attached Order. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America OF SUBSTITUTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Brizius, Erin)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America ( Fee Status: US Government) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C Category Form)(Brizius, Erin) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/14/2021) (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. Lowell General Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Roca, M.D.
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowell General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Gabryjelski, R.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucia Modesti, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Rodriguez, R.N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Erin E. Brizius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad O'Brien
Represented By: Andrew C. Meyer, Jr.
Represented By: Adam R. Satin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?