Berkley National Insurance Company v. Granite Telecommunications LLC et al
Plaintiff: Berkley National Insurance Company
Defendant: Granite Telecommunications LLC, Stephen Papsis and Atlantic Newport Realty LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv10626
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. While defendants represent that "[g]ood cause exists for the requested brief extension because Granite and Atlantic Newport require additional time to prepare their responsive pleading," they fail to specify the "good cause." In the future, to extend the schedule set by the federal civil rules, the parties must provide the court with the factual basis commending an extension. (Zierk, Marsha)
May 28, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 23, 2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Atlantic Newport Realty LLC, Granite Telecommunications LLC.(Ruby, Joshua)
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle R. Pascucci on behalf of Atlantic Newport Realty LLC, Granite Telecommunications LLC (Pascucci, Michelle)
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua N. Ruby on behalf of Atlantic Newport Realty LLC, Granite Telecommunications LLC (Ruby, Joshua)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Stephen Papsis served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Aylward, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Granite Telecommunications LLC served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Aylward, Michael)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Atlantic Newport Realty LLC served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Aylward, Michael)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8729146 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Berkley National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Aylward, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley National Insurance Company v. Granite Telecommunications LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Telecommunications LLC
Represented By: Michelle R. Pascucci
Represented By: Joshua N. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Papsis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Newport Realty LLC
Represented By: Michelle R. Pascucci
Represented By: Joshua N. Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley National Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael F. Aylward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?