Karila v. EF Education First International, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Kristine Karila
Defendant: EF Education First International, Ltd. and Go Ahead Vacations, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv10643
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean T. Carnathan on behalf of Kristine Karila (Carnathan, Sean)
May 27, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Corrigan on behalf of Kristine Karila (Corrigan, Brian)
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry M. Altman on behalf of Kristine Karila (Altman, Barry)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, EF Education First International, Ltd. answer due 7/30/2021; Go Ahead Vacations, Inc. answer due 7/30/2021. (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 30, 2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EF Education First International, Ltd., Go Ahead Vacations, Inc..(Mazzotta, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Ryan on behalf of Kristine Karila (Ryan, Elizabeth)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. Kelly on behalf of EF Education First International, Ltd., Go Ahead Vacations, Inc. (Kelly, Elizabeth)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mazzotta on behalf of EF Education First International, Ltd., Go Ahead Vacations, Inc. (Mazzotta, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey J. Wolkoff on behalf of EF Education First International, Ltd., Go Ahead Vacations, Inc. (Wolkoff, Harvey)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristine Karila. Go Ahead Vacations, Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2021, answer due 7/28/2021. (Roddy, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristine Karila. EF Education First International, Ltd. waiver sent on 4/29/2021, answer due 7/28/2021. (Roddy, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Go Ahead Vacations, Inc. c/o Matthew Mazzotta, Esq. on 04/29/2021 by Kristine Karila. Waiver of Service due by 6/1/2021. (Roddy, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to EF Education First International, Ltd. c/o Matthew Mazzotta, Esq. on 04/29/2021 by Kristine Karila. Waiver of Service due by 6/1/2021. (Roddy, John)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Go Ahead Vacations, Inc., EF Education First International, Ltd. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8733595 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Kristine Karila. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Roddy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karila v. EF Education First International, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EF Education First International, Ltd.
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Kelly
Represented By: Matthew Mazzotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Ahead Vacations, Inc.
Represented By: Harvey J. Wolkoff
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Kelly
Represented By: Matthew Mazzotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Karila
Represented By: John J. Roddy
Represented By: Brian T. Corrigan
Represented By: Sean T. Carnathan
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Ryan
Represented By: Barry M. Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?