Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. v. Wedge Water, LLC
Plaintiff: Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.
Defendant: Wedge Water, LLC doing business as Wave Soda
Case Number: 1:2021cv10669
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 29 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered: Wedge Water's Motion to Transfer (Docket No. #10 ) is DENIED.By June 23, 2021, Ocean Spray shall file an affidavit verifying that the majority of its anticipated witnesses and relevant documents are located in the District of Massachusetts, or correcting any misrepresentation(s) in its Opposition. After the motion to stay the California Case is decided, the parties shall confer and report, jointly if possible, the result of that decision, and whether that case will or may be transferred to the District of Massachusetts. (adminn, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 28 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #27 Motion for Protective Order Governing Confidentiality by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. Stipulated Protective Order attached. (Loret, Magdalena)
June 11, 2021 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Governing Confidentiality by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Snyder, John)
May 26, 2021 Filing 26 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Janet F. Satterthwaite and Julia Anne Matheson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
May 26, 2021 Filing 25 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added J. Tobias Rowe. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
May 26, 2021 Filing 24 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Andrew Levine. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
May 20, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION Status conference filed by Wedge Water, LLC. (Toms, Keith)
May 19, 2021 Filing 22 Withdrawal of motion: #16 Assented to MOTION for Limited Admission filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc... (Snyder, John)
May 19, 2021 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Julia Anne Matheson, Janet Satterthwaite Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8783372 by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Julia Anne Matheson certification, #2 Affidavit Janet Satterthwaite certification)(Snyder, John)
May 19, 2021 Filing 20 Plaintiff's Request for a Status conference by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc..(Snyder, John) Modified on 5/19/2021 to correct docket text. (Lara, Miguel).
May 18, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Wedge Water, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Toms, Keith)
May 10, 2021 Filing 18 Opposition re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California. filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Janet Satterthwaite declaration)(Snyder, John)
May 7, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wedge Water, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 3 Fold LLC for Wedge Water, LLC.. (Toms, Keith)
May 4, 2021 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Limited Admission by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Janet Satterthwaite certification, #2 Affidavit Julia Anne Matheson certification)(Snyder, John)
May 4, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Toms on behalf of Wedge Water, LLC (Toms, Keith)
May 4, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. All Defendants. (Snyder, John)
May 3, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California. Declaration of Nat Noone filed by Wedge Water, LLC. (Hornat, Alexander)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California. Declaration of Andrew Levine filed by Wedge Water, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Hornat, Alexander)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California. filed by Wedge Water, LLC. (Hornat, Alexander)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California. by Wedge Water, LLC.(Hornat, Alexander)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of J. Tobias Rowe Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8756790 by Wedge Water, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Attorney J. Tobias Rowe)(Hornat, Alexander)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew Levine Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8756787 by Wedge Water, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Attorney Andrew Levine)(Hornat, Alexander)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander T. Hornat on behalf of Wedge Water, LLC (Hornat, Alexander)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Snyder, John)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 7/21/2021. (Montes, Mariliz)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8739774 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3 to Complaint, #2 Category form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Form AO120)Please refer to entry #2 (Snyder, John) Modified on 4/22/2021 (Vieira, Leonardo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. v. Wedge Water, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wedge Water, LLC doing business as Wave Soda
Represented By: Alexander T. Hornat
Represented By: Andrew Levine
Represented By: Keith E. Toms
Represented By: J. Tobias Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Snyder
Represented By: Julia Anne Matheson
Represented By: Janet F. Satterthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?