American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: American Oversight and American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2021cv10761
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference, to be held by telephone, set for 7/27/2021 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine)
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Sady, Michael)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Oehlke, Krista)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. Acknowledgement filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Oehlke, Krista)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. Acknowledgement filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Oehlke, Krista)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Oversight. (Anthony, Katherine)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine M. Anthony on behalf of American Oversight (Anthony, Katherine)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Segal on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (Segal, Matthew)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts. (Oehlke, Krista)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts (McFadden, Daniel)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Immigration and Customs Enforcement Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8766115 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts, American Oversight. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Category Form)(Oehlke, Krista)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Oversight
Represented By: Katherine M. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Massachusetts
Represented By: Matthew Segal
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Krista Oehlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?