German-De lo Santos v. Departamento de Educacion de Puerto Rico
Plaintiff: Eliezer German-De Los Santos
Defendant: Departamento de Educacion de Puerto Rico
Case Number: 1:2021cv10779
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
May 12, 2021 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:20-cv-01212.
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER noted and granting #22 Motion In Compliance. The instant case shall be transferred to the District Court of Massachussets. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 5/10/2021. (MQ)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 Motion In Compliance WITH ORDER as to 21 Order,,,, Terminate Motions,,, filed by Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera on behalf of Eliezer German-De Los Santos Responses due by 10/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Hernandez-Rivera, Juan)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER noted #19 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding notification of Order to Plaintiff; noted #20 Motion In Compliance with Order. The Court has been very clear - no new counsel shall be appointed based on the proffered reasons. Counsel shall inform the Court on or before 9/28/2020 whether Plaintiff wishes to prosecute this case with the assistance of counsel Hernandez-Rivera or whether he wishes to proceed pro see. Those are Plaintiff's only two options. Moreover, the Amended Complaint is due on or before 10/8/2020. No further extensions shall be granted. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal without prejudice for failure to diligently prosecute and failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/24/2020. (MQ)
August 31, 2020 Filing 20 Motion In Compliance with Order as to 18 Order on Informative Motion,,, filed by Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera on behalf of Eliezer German-De Los Santos Responses due by 9/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Hernandez-Rivera, Juan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding notification of Order to Plaintiff filed by Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit notification of order)(Hernandez-Rivera, Juan)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER noted #17 INFORMATIVE motion. Once again, the Court will not appoint new counsel based on Plaintiff's proffered reasons. See Docket Nos. 9; 13. Counsel Hernandez-Rivera has been diligent in representing Plaintiff, while Plaintiff has been unnecessarily delaying the prosecution of this case. Plaintiff has two options: (i) continue this case with appointed counsel Hernandez-Rivera or (ii) continue this case pro se. Counsel shall inform Plaintiff of this Court's Order and provide him with copy of this Order in the Spanish language. Counsel shall inform the Court of Plaintiff's decision on or before 8/31/2020. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed pro se, he shall file an Amended Complaint specifying the basis for jurisdiction and the specific claims raised against Defendant on or before 9/21/2020. Failure to comply may result in dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/25/2020. (MQ)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Order due on August 17, 2020. (Doc. #14) filed by Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera on behalf of Eliezer German-De Los Santos Responses due by 8/31/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hernandez-Rivera, Juan)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER noted #15 Motion In Compliance as to 13 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 08/11/2020. (lir)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 Motion In Compliance as to 13 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, filed by Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera on behalf of Eliezer German-De Los Santos Responses due by 8/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 13 ) (Hernandez-Rivera, Juan)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as requested #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2020 to Amend Complaint. Amended Complaint due by 8/17/2020. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/6/2020. (MQ)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court has already denied Plaintiff's request. Docket No. 9. The Court reiterates that appointed counsel may competently represent Plaintiff, and counsel has been diligently working on this case. Plaintiff shall cooperate with counsel in the prosecution of this case or Plaintiff may litigate the case pro se, but the Court will not appoint new counsel based on the reasons stated herein. Counsel is instructed to provide a copy of this Order and the Court's order at Docket No. 9. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/6/2020. (MQ)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 Second MOTION to Withdraw AS PRO BONO COUNSEL Attorney as to Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera filed by Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera on behalf of Eliezer German-De Los Santos Responses due by 8/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 draft- amended complaint, #2 draft- statement)(Hernandez-Rivera, Juan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2020 to Amend Complaint Re: 10 Order filed by Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 10 ) (Hernandez-Rivera, Juan)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 5 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Counsel shall file an amended complaint by July 27, 2020, and shall specify the basis for jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/13/2020. (MQ)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. As a civil litigator, appointed counsel can become competent on the subject matter of this lawsuit through research and discovery. As such, the Court finds that appointment of new counsel is not warranted based on the grounds asserted herein. Plaintiff shall cooperate with counsel in the prosecution of this case and counsel shall diligently study the relevant case law to defend Plaintiff's rights. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/24/2020. (MQ)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw AS PRO BONO COUNSEL Attorney as to Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera filed by Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera on behalf of Eliezer German-De Los Santos Responses due by 6/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hernandez-Rivera, Juan) Modified on 6/17/2020 to remove restrictions as per counsels request and edit docket title text. (mg).
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Mail sent to Elizer German De Los Santos was returned as undeliverable. Mail was sent out on 5/28/2020. No other forwarding address available. (mg)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PRO BONO. Counsel Juan A. Hernandez-Rivera, Esq., appointed to represent Plaintiff: Eliezer German-De Los Santos (pro-se) re D.E. #5 Order. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2020. Manual Notification sent via regular mail to Plaintiff: Eliezer German-De los Santos & Counsel: Juan A. Hernandez-Rivera, Esq., re 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Eliezer German-De los Santos. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 5/13/2020.(mg) Modified on 5/14/2020 to edit plaintiffs name. (mg). Modified on 5/28/2020 to edit docket text re: docket entry. (mg).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Counsel shall confer with Plaintiff to review the legal requirements of the claims filed before this Court, and provide Plaintiff with an initial assessment of the viability of these claims. Counsel shall file an amended complaint by June 15, 2020, and shall specify the basis for jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 5/13/2020. (MQ)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Eliezer German-De Los Santos, pro se. (mg) Modified on 5/14/2020 to edit plaintiffs name. (mg).
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Eliezer German-De Los Santos, pro se. Responses due by 5/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg) Modified on 5/14/2020 to edit plaintiffs name. (mg).
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Departamento de Educacion de Puerto Rico, filed by Eliezer German-De Los Santos, pro se. Service due by 8/3/2020, (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet).(mg) Modified on 5/14/2020 to edit plaintiffs name. (mg).
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eliezer German-De los Santos, pro se. Responses due by 5/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg) Modified on 5/14/2020 to edit plaintiffs name. (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: German-De lo Santos v. Departamento de Educacion de Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Departamento de Educacion de Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer German-De Los Santos
Represented By: Juan Antonio Hernandez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?