Milliman, Inc. et al v. Gradient A.I. Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Milliman, Inc., Vigilytics LLC and Milliman Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Gradient A.I. Corp., Stanford A. Smith and Samuel Chase Pettus
Case Number: 1:2021cv10865
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to #34 MOTION for Leave to File Response To Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Partial Motion To Dismiss filed by Milliman Solutions, LLC, Milliman, Inc., Vigilytics LLC. (Graubart, Noah)
September 2, 2021 Filing 35 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #34 MOTION for Leave to File Response To Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Partial Motion To Dismiss ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (McDonagh, Christina)
September 1, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File Response To Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Partial Motion To Dismiss by Milliman Solutions, LLC, Milliman, Inc., Vigilytics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Graubart, Noah)
August 24, 2021 Filing 33 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bunis, Michael)
August 12, 2021 Filing 32 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Milliman Solutions, LLC, Milliman, Inc., Vigilytics LLC. (Graubart, Noah)
August 12, 2021 Filing 31 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #30 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Warnock, Douglas)
August 11, 2021 Filing 30 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss by Milliman Solutions, LLC, Milliman, Inc., Vigilytics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Surreply Brief)(Graubart, Noah)
August 4, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gradient A.I. Corp., Samuel Chase Pettus, Stanford A. Smith. (Bunis, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Filing 28 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #27 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Warnock, Douglas)
August 3, 2021 Filing 27 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss by Gradient A.I. Corp., Samuel Chase Pettus, Stanford A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Brief)(Bunis, Michael)
July 26, 2021 Filing 26 Opposition re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Milliman Solutions, LLC, Milliman, Inc., Vigilytics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Noah C. Graubart, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Graubart, Noah)
July 16, 2021 Filing 25 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 7/26/2021 (McDonagh, Christina)
July 15, 2021 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Milliman Solutions, LLC, Milliman, Inc., Vigilytics LLC.(Graubart, Noah)
July 7, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gradient A.I. Corp., Samuel Chase Pettus, Stanford A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wang, Sophie)
July 7, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gradient A.I. Corp., Samuel Chase Pettus, Stanford A. Smith. (Bunis, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gradient A.I. Corp., Samuel Chase Pettus, Stanford A. Smith.(Bunis, Michael)
July 7, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gradient A.I. Corp.. (Popeo, Paul)
July 7, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John Calhoun on behalf of Gradient A.I. Corp., Samuel Chase Pettus, Stanford A. Smith (Calhoun, John)
July 7, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophie F. Wang on behalf of Gradient A.I. Corp., Samuel Chase Pettus, Stanford A. Smith (Wang, Sophie)
July 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Bunis on behalf of Gradient A.I. Corp., Samuel Chase Pettus, Stanford A. Smith (Bunis, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered re: #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Motion DENIED; defendants shall file responsive pleadings on or before Wednesday, July 7, 2021. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 Opposition re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 16, 2021 to Answer or Respond to Complaint filed by Milliman Solutions, LLC, Milliman, Inc., Vigilytics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Centurelli Declaration)(Centurelli, Christopher)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 16, 2021 to Answer or Respond to Complaint by Gradient A.I. Corp., Samuel Chase Pettus, Stanford A. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Popeo, Paul)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Noah C. Graubart and Joseph R. Dorris. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Noah C. Graubart, Joseph R. Dorris Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8799315 by Vigilytics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Attorney Graubart, #2 Certificate of Attorney Dorris)(Dillon, Christopher)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Patrick J. McElhinny, Mark G. Knedeisen and Anna Shabalov. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gradient A.I. Corp. served on 5/26/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (Centurelli, Christopher)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Patrick J. McElhinny Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-8793103 by Milliman Solutions, LLC, Milliman, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit McElhinny Certificate, #2 Exhibit Knedeisen Certificate, #3 Exhibit Shabalov Certificate)(Centurelli, Christopher)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vigilytics LLC. (Dillon, Christopher)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Gradient A.I. Corp., Samuel Chase Pettus, Stanford A. Smith. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (McDonagh, Christina)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Milliman Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Milliman, Inc. for Milliman Solutions, LLC.. (Centurelli, Christopher)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Milliman, Inc.. (Centurelli, Christopher)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Centurelli, Christopher)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8791449 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Milliman Solutions, LLC, Milliman, Inc., Vigilytics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Civil Category Sheet, #11 Summons - Gradient A.I. Corp., #12 Summons - S. Smith, #13 Summons - S. Pettus)(Centurelli, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milliman, Inc. et al v. Gradient A.I. Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gradient A.I. Corp.
Represented By: Paul D. Popeo
Represented By: John Calhoun
Represented By: Michael H. Bunis
Represented By: Sophie F. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford A. Smith
Represented By: Paul D. Popeo
Represented By: John Calhoun
Represented By: Michael H. Bunis
Represented By: Sophie F. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Chase Pettus
Represented By: Paul D. Popeo
Represented By: John Calhoun
Represented By: Michael H. Bunis
Represented By: Sophie F. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milliman, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Centurelli
Represented By: Anna Shabalov
Represented By: Mark G. Knedeisen
Represented By: Patrick J. McElhinny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vigilytics LLC
Represented By: Christopher R. Dillon
Represented By: Joseph R. Dorris
Represented By: Noah Graubart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milliman Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Centurelli
Represented By: Anna Shabalov
Represented By: Mark G. Knedeisen
Represented By: Patrick J. McElhinny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?