Wilson et al v. Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC et al
Plaintiff: John B. Wilson, Leslie B Wiilson and John Wilson, Jr.
Defendant: Chris Smith, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix, Inc., Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC and 241C Films, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv10894
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Leslie B Wiilson, John B. Wilson, John Wilson, Jr. re #28 Memorandum & ORDER,, . (Kiely, Christian)
August 13, 2021 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #15 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Per Order of August 10, 2021 filed by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. (Albano, Jonathan)
August 10, 2021 Filing 28 Judge Mark L. Wolf: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that, by 12:00 noon on August 13, 2021, the parties shall file supplemental memoranda addressing: (1) whether California or Massachusetts law governs John Wilson, Jr.'s defamation claim and the implications of that issue for the pending motions; and (2) whether the fraudulent joinder doctrine applies to plaintiffs as well as defendants and, if not, whether this case should be remanded without prejudice to possible removal if the state court dismisses or grants defendants summary judgment on John Wilson, Jr.'s claims. See, Breland, 2019 WL 1466239, at *8. (Loret, Magdalena)
August 3, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Reply)(Hall, Emma)
August 3, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #23 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Leslie B Wiilson, John B. Wilson, John Wilson, Jr.. (Kiely, Christian)
August 3, 2021 Filing 25 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Leslie B. Wilson, John B. Wilson, John Wilson, Jr. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Loret, Magdalena)
August 3, 2021 Filing 24 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Combined Reply in Support of Ds' Motion to Dismiss and Opp. to Ps' Motion to Remand by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Loret, Magdalena)
July 29, 2021 Filing 23 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Leslie B Wiilson, John B. Wilson, John Wilson, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kiely, Christian)
July 23, 2021 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Combined Reply in Support of Ds' Motion to Dismiss and Opp. to Ps' Motion to Remand by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Combined Opp. and Reply, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Proposed Combined Opp. and Reply)(Hall, Emma)
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #15 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #19 Motion to Remand to State Court: This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2021 02:00 PM in Remote Proceeding: Boston before Judge Mark L. Wolf. (Loret, Magdalena)
July 9, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Leslie B Wiilson, John B. Wilson, John Wilson, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kiely, Christian)
July 9, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Leslie B Wiilson, John B. Wilson, John Wilson, Jr..(Kiely, Christian)
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Assented to Motion for Leave to File Combined Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Leslie B. Wilson, John B. Wilson, John Wilson, Jr. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Loret, Magdalena)
July 2, 2021 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Combined Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Leslie B Wiilson, John B. Wilson, John Wilson, Jr..(Kiely, Christian)
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. (Loret, Magdalena)
June 21, 2021 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 7/6/2021) by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith.(Albano, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan M. Albano re #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Pursuant to Par. 1 June 17, 2021 Order by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. (Albano, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to June 17, 2021 Order filed by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. (Albano, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan M. Albano Filed Pursuant to Par. 2 of June 17, 2021 Order by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. (Albano, Jonathan)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Mark L. Wolf: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that, by June 21, 2021, defendants shall file: 1. An affidavit and memorandum addressing the issue of subject matter jurisdiction as described in paragraph 2 of the June 2, 2021 Order, including, but not limited to, the standards and appropriate procedures for determining whether diversity jurisdiction exists, and whether any discovery is necessary to resolve this issue.1 See,, Valentin v. Hosp. Bella Vista, 254 F.3d 358, 362-63 & n.3 (1st Cir. 2001); Torres-Negron v. J & N Records, LLC, 504 F.3d 151, 162-63 (1st Cir. 2007); Kerns v. United States, 585 F.3d 187, 193 (4th Cir. 2009). 2. Defendants' counsel shall file an affidavit seeking to explain and justify why they did not comply with the June 2, 2021 Order, and, therefore, why they should not be sanctioned pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(f)(1)(C) for failing to obey the June 2, 2021 Order. (Loret, Magdalena)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record All Parties.. (Hall, Emma)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF EXHIBIT J (CD SUBMITTED) re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. (Lara, Miguel)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. (Albano, Jonathan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P)(Albano, Jonathan)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to June 11, 2021 to Respond to Complaint and to July 9, 2021 for Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith. (Loret, Magdalena)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 11, 2021 to Respond to Complaint and to July 9, 2021 for Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss by 241C Films, LLC, Jon Karmen, Library Films, LLC, Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC, Netflix, Inc., Chris Smith.(Albano, Jonathan)
May 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian G. Kiely on behalf of Leslie B Wiilson, John B. Wilson, John Wilson, Jr. (Kiely, Christian)
May 28, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
May 28, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
May 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8796859 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Emma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John B. Wilson
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Christian G. Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie B Wiilson
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Christian G. Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Christian G. Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Smith
Represented By: Jonathan M. Albano
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Karmen
Represented By: Jonathan M. Albano
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Library Films, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Albano
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Albano
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix Worldwide Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Albano
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 241C Films, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Albano
Represented By: Emma D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?