Ascend Capital LLC v. Moolex, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ascend Capital LLC
Defendant: Jane Doe & John Doe, Inc., Rahul Chaturvedi and Moolex, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv10972
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Referring Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 21 Opposition re #20 MOTION to Stay filed by Ascend Capital LLC. (Mack, David)
July 29, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay by Rahul Chaturvedi.(Halley, Taylor)
July 29, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 Motion for Transfer of Actions to the District of Massachusetts Pursuant to 28 USC sec. 1407 for Consolidated or Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings filed by Rahul Chaturvedi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Halley, Taylor)
July 29, 2021 Filing 18 Motion for Transfer of Actions to the District of Massachusetts Pursuant to 28 USC sec. 1407 for Consolidated or Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings by Rahul Chaturvedi.(Halley, Taylor)
July 15, 2021 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
July 15, 2021 Filing 15 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Mack, David)
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 DEFENDANT RAHUL CHATURVEDl'S MOTION FOR MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF by Rahul Chaturvedi.(Russo, Noreen)
July 9, 2021 Filing 14 Copy re 13 Order, 12 Reminder to Submit Consent or Refusal of MJ Jurisdiction, 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer mailed to Rahul Chaturvedi on 7/9/21. (Russo, Noreen)
July 9, 2021 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. L.R. 83.5.5(c) provides that a limited liability company may not appear pro se, nor may an individual officer appear on behalf of any entity. Time is extended to July 28, 2021 for Moolex, LLC to obtain counsel and file a response. (Russo, Noreen)
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The court grants a 21 day extension. Response due by cob 7/28/21. (Russo, Noreen)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time 45 days to File Answer by Rahul Chaturvedi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Russo, Noreen)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Stephanie Parker Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 4(l)(1) by Ascend Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Parker, Stephanie)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Rahul Chaturvedi served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021. (Mack, David)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ascend Capital LLC. (Mack, David)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Mack, David)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark AO 120. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case. (Vieira, Leonardo)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint by Ascend Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mack, David)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8813764 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ascend Capital LLC.(Mack, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ascend Capital LLC v. Moolex, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe & John Doe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahul Chaturvedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moolex, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ascend Capital LLC
Represented By: David B Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?