Attabotics, Inc. v. URBX, Inc.
Plaintiff: Attabotics, Inc.
Defendant: URBX, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11051
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 17 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David C. Van Dyke. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kristopher K. Hulliberger. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 29, 2021 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Van Dyke Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8879832 by Attabotics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Van Dyke)(Duggan, Christopher)
July 29, 2021 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kristopher Hulliberger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8879811 by Attabotics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kristopher Hulliberger)(Duggan, Christopher)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Duggan on behalf of Attabotics, Inc. (Duggan, Christopher)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer URBX, Inc. answer due 9/16/2021. (Folan, Karen)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Andrew D. Gish, Marti A. Johnson and Raymond Bilderbeck. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew D. Gish, Marti A. Johnson, and Raymond Bilderbeck Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-8878917 by URBX, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Andrew D. Gish, #2 Certification of Marti A. Johnson, #3 Certification of Raymond Bilderbeck)(Folkman, Theodore)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by URBX, Inc.. (Folkman, Theodore)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/16/2021 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by URBX, Inc..(Folkman, Theodore)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Attabotics, Inc.. Attabotics, Inc. served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Attabotics, Inc.. (Duggan, Christopher)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Attabotics, Inc.. (Duggan, Christopher)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to URBX, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet.(McDonagh, Christina)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Attabotics, Inc.. (Duggan, Christopher)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Attabotics, Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8835170 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Attabotics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duggan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attabotics, Inc. v. URBX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URBX, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Gish
Represented By: Marti A. Johnson
Represented By: Raymond J. Bilderbeck
Represented By: Theodore J. Folkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attabotics, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Duggan
Represented By: David C. Van Dyke
Represented By: Kristopher K. Hulliberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?