Martillo v. Twitter Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joachim Martillo
Defendant: Twitter Inc., Facebook Inc., A Medium Corporation, LinkedIn Corp., The Stanford Daily Publishing Corp and Harvard Crimson Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv11119
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order entered from the U.S. Supreme Court. The Petition for a Writ of Certiorari is Denied. (Paine, Matthew)
November 10, 2021 Filing 13 Copy re 12 Order on Motion for Reconsideration mailed to Joachim Martillo on 11/10/21. (mkz)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #7 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Joachim Martillo. Mr. Martillo has not identified any basis which would cause the court to alter its order dismissing this action. (mkz)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 USCA Case Number 21-1921 for #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Joachim Martillo. (Dore, Samantha)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Appeal. (Dore, Samantha)
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Order Dismissing Case by Joachim Martillo (Fee Status: IFP granted) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 11/29/2021. (Dore, Samantha)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Reconsideration of Final Order of Dismissal filed by Joachim Martillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Dore, Samantha)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration of Final Order of Dismissal by Joachim Martillo.(Dore, Samantha)
October 15, 2021 Filing 6 Copy re [Dkt # 4] Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, [Dkt # 5] Order Dismissing Case mailed to Joachim Marillo on 10/15/20. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 3)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and ordering that action be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (PSSA, 3)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joachim Martillo.(Castilla, Francis)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joachim Martillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martillo v. Twitter Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joachim Martillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Medium Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LinkedIn Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stanford Daily Publishing Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Crimson Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?