Jace Boston, LLC et al v. Landmark American Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jace Boston, LLC and Arthur Leon
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Co., American Safety Indemnity Co., First Mercury Insurance Co. and Navigators Specialty Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11120
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 29 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Assented-to Motion #28 . Plaintiffs' time to respond to the pending motions to dismiss is extended to September 15, 2021. Plaintiffs may file a single opposition to all four motions, not to exceed 25 pages. The opposition shall include a table of contents and table of authorities (not counted towards the 25 page limit). (Kelly, Danielle)
August 9, 2021 Filing 28 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 15, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Jace Boston, LLC, Arthur Leon.(Furman, Matthew)
August 4, 2021 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Navigators Specialty Insurance Co.. (Thorvaldsen, Kara)
August 4, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Navigators Specialty Insurance Co..(Thorvaldsen, Kara)
August 4, 2021 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navigators Specialty Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent The Navigators Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Navigators Specialty Insurance Co... (Thorvaldsen, Kara)
August 4, 2021 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by First Mercury Insurance Co.. (Ryan, Patrick)
August 4, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by First Mercury Insurance Co..(Ryan, Patrick)
August 4, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Landmark American Insurance Co.. (Pollock, Russell)
August 4, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Landmark American Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollock, Russell)
August 4, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Safety Indemnity Co.. (O'Donnell, Barbara)
August 4, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Safety Indemnity Co.. (O'Donnell, Barbara)
August 4, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by American Safety Indemnity Co..(O'Donnell, Barbara)
August 2, 2021 Filing 17 STATE COURT Record. (Thorvaldsen, Kara)
July 27, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara A. O'Donnell on behalf of American Safety Indemnity Co. (O'Donnell, Barbara)
July 15, 2021 Filing 15 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to August 4, 2021 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter G. Hermes on behalf of First Mercury Insurance Co. (Hermes, Peter)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First Mercury Insurance Co.. (Ryan, Patrick)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick T. Ryan on behalf of First Mercury Insurance Co. (Ryan, Patrick)
July 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Furman on behalf of Jace Boston, LLC, Arthur Leon (Furman, Matthew)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 4, 2021 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Navigators Specialty Insurance Co..(Thorvaldsen, Kara)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added William A. Rubert. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William A. Rubert Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8850188 by Landmark American Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Pro Hac Vice Attorney)(Pollock, Russell)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Landmark American Insurance Co.. (Pollock, Russell)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell X. Pollock on behalf of Landmark American Insurance Co. (Pollock, Russell)
July 8, 2021 Filing 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Simantob. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Simantob Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8849483 by Navigators Specialty Insurance Co..(Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2021: #1 Exhibit A) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/8/2021) (Kelly, Danielle).
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Navigators Specialty Insurance Co. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8848465 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Additional State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Notice, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Case Category Sheet, #6 List of Pending Motions)(Thorvaldsen, Kara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jace Boston, LLC et al v. Landmark American Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jace Boston, LLC
Represented By: David H. Rich
Represented By: Matthew S. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Leon
Represented By: David H. Rich
Represented By: Matthew S. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Co.
Represented By: Russell X. Pollock
Represented By: William A. Rubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Co.
Represented By: Barbara A. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Co.
Represented By: Peter G. Hermes
Represented By: Patrick T. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Kara G. Thorvaldsen
Represented By: David Simantob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?