Sparta Insurance Company v. Pennsylvania General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: SPARTA Insurance Company
Defendant: Pennsylvania General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv11205
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 18 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Pennsylvania General Insurance Company answer due 10/5/2021. (McKillop, Matthew)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION And Joint Motion For Order Extending Defendant's Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint by Pennsylvania General Insurance Company. (Dew, John) Modified on 9/13/2021 (McKillop, Matthew).
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pennsylvania General Insurance Company answer due 9/14/2021. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION And Joint Motion For Order Extending Defendant's Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint by Pennsylvania General Insurance Company. (Dew, John) Modified on 8/27/2021 (McKillop, Matthew).
August 26, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE=Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Carroll, James)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Dew on behalf of Pennsylvania General Insurance Company (Dew, John)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Joint Motion For Order Extending Defendant's Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint. (Russo, Noreen)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION And Joint Motion For Order Extending Defendant's Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint by Sparta Insurance Company. (Carroll, James) Modified on 8/17/2021 (Russo, Noreen).
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Carroll, James)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Pennsylvania General Insurance Company served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (Carroll, James)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Pennsylvania General Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SPARTA Insurance Company. (Carroll, James)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Saidel-Goley on behalf of SPARTA Insurance Company (Saidel-Goley, Isaac)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Clark on behalf of SPARTA Insurance Company (Clark, Christopher)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Pennsylvania General Insurance Company Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8874694 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by SPARTA Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Carroll, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparta Insurance Company v. Pennsylvania General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPARTA Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher G. Clark
Represented By: Isaac Saidel-Goley
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania General Insurance Company
Represented By: John F. Dew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?