A. Simon & Sons, Inc. v. Simonfurniture International Inc. et al
Plaintiff: A. Simon & Sons, Inc., d/b/a Simon's Furniture and A. Simon & Sons, Inc. doing business as Simon's Furniture
Defendant: Simonfurniture International Inc. and Simon Warehouse Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11254
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 27 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Molloy, Maryellen)
September 28, 2021 Filing 26 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Simon Warehouse Inc., Simonfurniture International Inc..(Kelly, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2021 Filing 25 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 1, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 10/1/2021. (Lara, Miguel)
September 20, 2021 Filing 24 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 1, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Simon Warehouse Inc., Simonfurniture International Inc..(Kelly, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2021 Filing 23 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew T. Furton. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
September 15, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Simon Warehouse Inc., Simonfurniture International Inc..(Kelly, Elizabeth)
September 14, 2021 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew T. Furton Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8947039 by Simon Warehouse Inc., Simonfurniture International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kelly, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Samuel Sussman in Support re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by A. Simon & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Sussman, Samuel)
September 10, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Jared Simon in Support re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by A. Simon & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Sussman, Samuel)
September 10, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by A. Simon & Sons, Inc.. (Sussman, Samuel)
September 10, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by A. Simon & Sons, Inc..(Sussman, Samuel)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time Response due by September 15, 2021. (PBS, law6)
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Simon Warehouse Inc.. (Kelly, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Simonfurniture International Inc.. (Kelly, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 15, 2021 to Respond to the Complaint by Simon Warehouse Inc., Simonfurniture International Inc..(Kelly, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth H. Kelly on behalf of Simon Warehouse Inc., Simonfurniture International Inc. (Kelly, Elizabeth)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A. Simon & Sons, Inc.. (Sussman, Samuel)
August 6, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by A. Simon & Sons, Inc.. Simonfurniture International Inc. served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. Acknowledgement filed by A. Simon & Sons, Inc.. (Sussman, Samuel)
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by A. Simon & Sons, Inc.. Simon Warehouse Inc. served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. Acknowledgement filed by A. Simon & Sons, Inc.. (Sussman, Samuel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Dkt. No. 5. corrected because incorrect event used. (Lara, Miguel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Lara, Miguel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel J. Sussman on behalf of A. Simon & Sons, Inc. (Sussman, Samuel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 DISREGARD- NOTICE by A. Simon & Sons, Inc. ao 120 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Common Law Trademarks (Glovsky, Susan) Modified on 8/3/2021 - see notice of correction dated 8/3/2021. (Lara, Miguel).
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Report on Filing or Determination Re: Patent or Trademark AO 120. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms/Local Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Report on the filing of patent/trademark case. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Simon Warehouse Inc., Simonfurniture International Inc. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8885081 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by A. Simon & Sons, Inc., d/b/a Simon's Furniture. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Glovsky, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A. Simon & Sons, Inc. v. Simonfurniture International Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Simon & Sons, Inc., d/b/a Simon's Furniture
Represented By: Susan G. L. Glovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Simon & Sons, Inc. doing business as Simon's Furniture
Represented By: Susan G. L. Glovsky
Represented By: Samuel J. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simonfurniture International Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. Furton
Represented By: Elizabeth H. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Warehouse Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. Furton
Represented By: Elizabeth H. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?