Perrino v. Kijakaz
Plaintiff: John Perrino
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv11267
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Nagelberg on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Nagelberg, James)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by John Perrino. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/24/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Acknowledgement filed by John Perrino. (Paladino, Joseph)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. Procedural Order re Social Security Action. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF (re: service by USMS), copy of LR 4.1 (PSSA, 4)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, shall be automatically substituted as the defendant in this case. The Clerk shall issue summons for service of the defendant. The plaintiff may elect to have service made by the United States Marshal Service. If directed by the plaintiff to do so, the United States Marshal shall serve the summons, complaint and this order upon defendant, in the manner directed by the plaintiff, with all costs of service to be advanced by the United States. The plaintiff is responsible for providing the USMS all copies for service and for completing a USM-285 form for each party to be served. The USM-285 form may be found at www.usmarshals.gov/process/usm285.pdf and is also available from the Clerk upon request. (PSSA, 4)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by John Perrino. (Paladino, Joseph)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Perrino.(Burgos, Sandra)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by John Perrino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 civil cover sheet)(Paladino, Joseph) Modified entry on 8/12/2021 (adminn, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrino v. Kijakaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Perrino
Represented By: Joseph M. Paladino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: James J. Nagelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Christopher A. Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?