Estados Unidos Mexicanos v. Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Estados Unidos Mexicanos
Defendant: Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc., Beretta USA Corp., Baretta Holdings SPA, Colt's Manufacturing Co., Inc., Glock, Inc., Glock Ges.m.b.H., Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc., Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc. doing business as Interstate Arms, Century International Arms, Inc. and Colt's Manufacturing Co. LLC
Amicus Curiae: International Law Professors, Non-Party Proposed Amici, Professors Of Transnational Litigation, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, California, State of, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, District of Columbia, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maryland, State of, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, New York, State of, Oregon, State of, Antigua & Barbuda, Belize, The Association for Public Policies d/b/a/ the Latin American and Caribbean Network for Human Security ("SEHLAC"), Everytown for Gun Safety and Gun Violence Prevention Groups
Case Number: 1:2021cv11269
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 159 Joint Response by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (Lelling, Andrew)
June 6, 2022 Filing 158 Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #150 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Brunell, Richard)
April 12, 2022 Filing 157 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Motion Hearing held by video on 4/12/2022. Case called; Arguments heard re Pending Motions to Dismiss. Court takes matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net.)(Attorneys present: Steve D. Shadowen, Jonathan Lowy, Richard M. Brunell and Tina J. Miranda for the plaintiff. Andrew E. Lelling, Anthony Dick, Michael B. DE Leeuw, John F. Renzulli, Michael L. Rice and John G. O'Neill) (McKillop, Matthew)
April 12, 2022 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by John Kennedy McDonald on behalf of Beretta USA Corp. (McDonald, John)
April 11, 2022 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina J. Miranda on behalf of Estados Unidos Mexicanos (Miranda, Tina)
April 1, 2022 Filing 154 Letter/request (non-motion) from Defendants proposing order of arguments on pending Motions to Dismiss with Consent of Plaintiff. (Malsch, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2022 Filing 153 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #114 MOTION of Gun Violence Prevention Groups for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae. (McKillop, Matthew)
March 24, 2022 Filing 152 SUR-REPLY to Motion re #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Lack of Article III Standing, and for failure to state a claim, #60 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #56 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sturm, Ruger's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), #66 Joint MOTION to Dismiss , #69 MOTION to Dismiss , #73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Rule 7.1 Statement and Memorandum of Law, #70 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
March 24, 2022 Filing 151 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #150 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (McKillop, Matthew)
March 23, 2022 Filing 150 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Plaintiff's Sur-reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss)(Brunell, Richard)
March 21, 2022 Filing 149 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #148 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tina J. Miranda. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 21, 2022 Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tina J. Miranda Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9235906 by Estados Unidos Mexicanos.(Brunell, Richard)
March 15, 2022 Filing 147 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2022 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (McKillop, Matthew)
March 14, 2022 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Lack of Article III Standing, and for failure to state a claim filed by Glock, Inc.. (Malsch, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2022 Filing 145 REPLY to Response to #73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Rule 7.1 Statement and Memorandum of Law filed by Beretta USA Corp.. (DE Leeuw, Michael)
March 14, 2022 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B. DE Leeuw on behalf of Beretta USA Corp. (DE Leeuw, Michael)
March 14, 2022 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc.. (Porter, James)
March 14, 2022 Filing 142 REPLY to Response to #60 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc.. (Adukonis, Nora)
March 14, 2022 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to #70 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Century International Arms, Inc.. (Yannetti, Joseph)
March 14, 2022 Filing 140 Joint REPLY to Response to #66 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc., Beretta USA Corp., Century International Arms, Inc., Colt's Manufacturing Co. LLC, Glock, Inc., Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc., Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc.. (Lelling, Andrew)
March 14, 2022 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to #69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc.. (Lelling, Andrew)
March 14, 2022 Filing 138 REPLY to Response to #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Colt's Manufacturing Co. LLC. (O'Neill, John)
March 14, 2022 Filing 137 REPLY to Response to #56 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sturm, Ruger's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) with Certificate of Service filed by Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc.. (Handler, Jonathan)
February 15, 2022 Filing 136 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #135 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/14/2022 to File Joint and Individual Replies. (McKillop, Matthew)
February 11, 2022 Filing 135 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/14/2022 to File Response/Reply as to #60 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #56 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sturm, Ruger's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2), #66 Joint MOTION to Dismiss , #70 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Lack of Article III Standing, and for failure to state a claim, #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #69 MOTION to Dismiss , #73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Rule 7.1 Statement and Memorandum of Law and a limit of 35 pages for Defendants' Reply in Support of their Joint Motion by Glock, Inc..(Malsch, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2022 Filing 134 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by William Taylor on behalf of Antigua & Barbuda, Belize, The Association for Public Policies. (Taylor, William)
February 8, 2022 Filing 133 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Aaron Haier on behalf of Antigua & Barbuda, Belize, The Association for Public Policies. (Haier, Aaron)
February 8, 2022 Filing 132 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by James Mandilk on behalf of Antigua & Barbuda, Belize, The Association for Public Policies. (Mandilk, James)
February 8, 2022 Filing 131 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Roberto Gonzalez on behalf of Antigua & Barbuda, Belize, The Association for Public Policies. (Gonzalez, Roberto)
February 7, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawson E. Fite on behalf of Gun Violence Prevention Groups (Fite, Lawson)
February 4, 2022 Filing 129 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Wendy Kennedy Venoit (w/d of Michael Savino) (Venoit, Wendy)
February 4, 2022 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Kennedy Venoit on behalf of Beretta USA Corp. (Venoit, Wendy)
February 3, 2022 Filing 127 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Julia Tarver-Mason Wood on behalf of Antigua & Barbuda, Belize, The Association for Public Policies. (Wood, Julia)
February 3, 2022 Filing 126 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Antigua & Barbuda, Belize, The Association for Public Policies . (Parker, Crystal)
February 3, 2022 Filing 125 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Gun Violence Prevention Groups Leave to File Granted 2/03/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Licensed Gun Dealers in the United States and Mexico, #2 Exhibit B - Images of Guns)(Pollack, James)
February 3, 2022 Filing 124 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Non-Party Proposed Amici Amici Curiae Brief of Scholars of International Law in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Sobol, Thomas)
February 3, 2022 Filing 123 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Non-Party Proposed Amici Prosecutors in Cities Across the United States, Leave to File Granted 2/3/22. (Leonida, Ellen)
February 3, 2022 Filing 122 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Non-Party Proposed Amici Mexican Activists, Scholars & Victims, Leave to File Granted 2/3/22. (Duncan, David)
February 3, 2022 Filing 121 AMICUS BRIEF filed by California, State of, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, District of Columbia, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maryland, State of, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, New York, State of, Oregon, State of . (Dewar, Elizabeth)
February 3, 2022 Filing 120 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting D. #96 , #105 , #109 , #110 , #112 and #113 MOTIONS for Leave to File Amicus Briefs ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (McKillop, Matthew)
February 3, 2022 Filing 119 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #118 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Roberto Gonzalez, Julia Tarver Mason Wood, James Mandilk, Aaron Haier, and William Taylor. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
February 2, 2022 Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Roberto Gonzalez, Julia Tarver Mason Wood, James Mandilk, Aaron Haier, and William Taylor Filing fee: $ 500, receipt number AMADC-9166248 by Antigua & Barbuda, Belize, The Association for Public Policies. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Roberto Gonzalez, #2 Certification of Julia Tarver Mason Wood, #3 Certification of James Mandilk, #4 Certification of Aaron Haier, #5 Certification of William Taylor)(Parker, Crystal)
February 1, 2022 Filing 117 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #116 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lawson E. Fite. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
January 31, 2022 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lawson E. Fite Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9162247 by Everytown for Gun Safety.(Pollack, James)
January 31, 2022 Filing 115 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by John A. Freedman on behalf of Non-Party Proposed Amici. (Freedman, John)
January 31, 2022 Filing 114 MOTION of Gun Violence Prevention Groups for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae re. #66 Defendant's Joint Motion to Dismiss entered by James Pollack on behalf of Everytown for Gun Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Pollack, James) Modified on 2/1/2022 to correct filing event used by attorney and docket text(McManus, Caetlin).
January 31, 2022 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Antigua & Barbuda, Belize, The Association for Public Policies. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief)(Parker, Crystal)
January 31, 2022 Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief of Scholars of International Law in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Non-Party Proposed Amici. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(Sobol, Thomas)
January 31, 2022 Filing 111 Opposition re #66 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Filing 110 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, California, State of, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, District of Columbia, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maryland, State of, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, New Jersey, State of, New Mexico, State of, New York, State of, Oregon, State of. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief)(Dewar, Elizabeth)
January 31, 2022 Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to File As Amici Curiae by Professors Of Transnational Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Amicus Brief)(Colbert, Edward)
January 31, 2022 Filing 108 DECLARATION of Nicholas W. Shadowen in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit)(Brunell, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward V. Colbert, III on behalf of Professors Of Transnational Litigation (Colbert, Edward)
January 31, 2022 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward V. Colbert, III on behalf of Professors Of Transnational Litigation (Colbert, Edward)
January 31, 2022 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Non-Party Proposed Amici.(Leonida, Ellen)
January 31, 2022 Filing 104 Opposition re #60 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Witmer d/b/a Interstate Arms filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Filing 103 Opposition re #56 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sturm, Ruger's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by Ruger filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Filing 102 Opposition re #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Lack of Article III Standing, and for failure to state a claim filed by Glock filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Filing 101 Opposition re #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Colt filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Filing 100 Opposition re #70 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Century filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Filing 99 Opposition re #73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Rule 7.1 Statement and Memorandum of Law filed by Beretta filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Filing 98 Opposition re #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Barrett filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Filing 97 Opposition re #69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Smith & Wesson filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Non-Party Proposed Amici. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Duncan, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by David Duncan on behalf of Non-Party Proposed Amici (Duncan, David)
January 31, 2022 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Bernstein on behalf of Non-Party Proposed Amici (Bernstein, Max)
January 28, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Salomon on behalf of Non-Party Proposed Amici (Salomon, Sarah)
January 28, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew B. Borden on behalf of Non-Party Proposed Amici (Borden, Matthew)
January 28, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Valentik Leonida on behalf of Non-Party Proposed Amici (Leonida, Ellen)
January 28, 2022 Filing 90 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #86 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sarah Salomon. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 28, 2022 Filing 89 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #85 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Matthew Borden. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 28, 2022 Filing 88 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Max Bernstein. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 28, 2022 Filing 87 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ellen V. Leonida. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McDonagh, Christina)
January 28, 2022 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sarah Salomon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9159346 by Non-Party Proposed Amici. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
January 28, 2022 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew Borden Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9159335 by Non-Party Proposed Amici. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
January 28, 2022 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Max B. Bernstein Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9159327 by Non-Party Proposed Amici. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
January 28, 2022 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ellen V. Leonida Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9159314 by Non-Party Proposed Amici. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sobol, Thomas)
January 28, 2022 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Sobol on behalf of International Law Professors (Sobol, Thomas)
December 31, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE by Estados Unidos Mexicanos of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Beretta Holding S.p.A. and Glock Ges.m.b.H (Brunell, Richard)
December 23, 2021 Filing 80 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Daniel G. Litchfield. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McDonagh, Christina)
December 22, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daniel G. Litchfield Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9111600 by Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Daniel G. Litchfield)(Adukonis, Nora)
November 30, 2021 Filing 78 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Electronic Order entered on 11/24/21 D. 76 is vacated. Counsel to continue to follow the schedule granted by the Court on 9/17/21 D. 39 . Motion hearing set for 1/27/22 at 2:00 PM is cancelled. (McKillop, Matthew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 77 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motions to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (In person with remote access provided) before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (McKillop, Matthew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 76 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff Estados Unidos Mexicanos shall file any opposition to defendants' motions to dismiss (Docket Nos. #56 , #58 , #60 , #62 , #64 , #66 , #69 , #70 , #73 ) by December 23, 2021. Defendants shall file any reply memoranda by January 10, 2022. A hearing on the motions to dismiss is hereby set for Thursday, January 27, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel to notify the clerk by January 20th whether they intend to appear in person or by video. (McKillop, Matthew)
November 23, 2021 Filing 75 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John K. McDonald and Michael B. de Leeuw. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
November 22, 2021 Filing 74 MOTION to Modify Memorandum of Law by Beretta USA Corp..(Savino, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Rule 7.1 Statement and Memorandum of Law by Beretta USA Corp.. (Attachments: #1 rule 7.1 Statement, #2 Memorandum of Law)(Savino, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Support re #69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc.. (Lelling, Andrew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Support re #70 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Century International Arms, Inc.. (Yannetti, Joseph)
November 22, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Responses due by 12/6/2021) by Century International Arms, Inc..(Yannetti, Joseph)
November 22, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc..(Lelling, Andrew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John K. McDonald and Michael B. de Leeuw Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number AMADC-9067335 by Beretta USA Corp..(Savino, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Filing 67 Joint MEMORANDUM in Support re #66 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc., Beretta USA Corp., Century International Arms, Inc., Colt's Manufacturing Co. LLC, Glock, Inc., Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc., Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc.. (Lelling, Andrew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc., Beretta USA Corp., Century International Arms, Inc., Colt's Manufacturing Co. LLC, Glock, Inc., Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc., Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc., Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc..(Lelling, Andrew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Support re #64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Colt's Manufacturing Co. LLC. (O'Neill, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Colt's Manufacturing Co. LLC.(O'Neill, John)
November 22, 2021 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Support re #62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Lack of Article III Standing, and for failure to state a claim filed by Glock, Inc.. (Malsch, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , for Lack of Article III Standing, and for failure to state a claim by Glock, Inc..(Malsch, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Support re #60 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc.. (Adukonis, Nora)
November 22, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc..(Adukonis, Nora)
November 22, 2021 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Support re #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc.. (Porter, James)
November 22, 2021 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc..(Porter, James)
November 22, 2021 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Support re #56 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sturm, Ruger's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc.. (Handler, Jonathan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sturm, Ruger's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) by Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc..(Handler, Jonathan)
November 22, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Savino on behalf of Beretta USA Corp. (Savino, Michael)
October 27, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Rice on behalf of Colt's Manufacturing Co. LLC (Rice, Michael)
October 19, 2021 Filing 53 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #52 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added S. Jan Hueber. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
October 15, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of S. Jan Hueber Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9015275 by Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Adukonis, Nora) Modified on 10/19/2021 to include payment information (McManus, Caetlin).
October 15, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Nora R. Adukonis on behalf of Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc. (Adukonis, Nora)
October 1, 2021 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Glock, Inc.. (Durney, Peter)
October 1, 2021 Filing 49 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James B. Vogts. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Currie, Haley)
October 1, 2021 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sturm, Ruger & Co., Inc. for Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc... (Handler, Jonathan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 47 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James B. Vogts Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8987276 by Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Handler, Jonathan)
October 1, 2021 Filing 46 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael L. Rice. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (McManus, Caetlin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 45 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jeffrey M. Malsch. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 44 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher Renzulli. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (McManus, Caetlin)
September 30, 2021 Filing 43 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael L. Rice Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8985669 by Colt's Manufacturing Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(O'Neill, John)
September 22, 2021 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Smith & Wesson, Inc., Other Affiliate Smith & Wesson Sales Company for Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc... (Lelling, Andrew)
September 21, 2021 Filing 41 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey M. Malsch Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8965773 by Glock, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of J. M. Malsch)(Hartnett, Patricia)
September 21, 2021 Filing 40 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher Renzulli Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8965685 by Glock, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of C. Renzulli)(Hartnett, Patricia)
September 17, 2021 Filing 39 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. granting #19 Assented to MOTION Regarding Briefing Schedule and Page Limits for Anticipated Motions to Dismiss (McKillop, Matthew)
September 10, 2021 Filing 38 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) Modified on 9/10/2021 (Halley, Taylor).
September 10, 2021 Filing 37 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Anthony Pisciotti, Danny Lallis, and Ryan Erdreich. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
September 9, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Warren Kinney Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8938344 by Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification)(Keenan, Trevor)
September 9, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James W. Porter, II Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8938317 by Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification)(Keenan, Trevor)
September 9, 2021 Filing 34 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John F. Renzulli Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8938050 by Glock, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of J. Renzulli)(Durney, Peter)
September 9, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony J. Dick Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8937947 by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Anthony Dick Affidavit)(Lelling, Andrew)
September 9, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Noel J. Francisco Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8937678 by Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Noel Francisco Affidavit)(Lelling, Andrew)
September 8, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Lelling on behalf of Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. (Lelling, Andrew)
September 8, 2021 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc.. (Campbell, James)
September 8, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc. (Campbell, James)
September 8, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor J. Keenan on behalf of Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc. (Keenan, Trevor)
September 8, 2021 Filing 27 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony Pisciotti, Danny Lallis and Ryan Erdreich Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-8936023 by Century International Arms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Yannetti, Joseph)
September 8, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G. Yannetti on behalf of Century International Arms, Inc. (Yannetti, Joseph)
September 7, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. Hartnett on behalf of Glock, Inc. (Hartnett, Patricia)
September 2, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. O'Neill on behalf of Colt's Manufacturing Co., Inc. (O'Neill, John)
September 2, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine M. Netski on behalf of Colt's Manufacturing Co., Inc. (Netski, Christine)
September 2, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith H. Bensten on behalf of Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc. (Bensten, Keith)
September 2, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan I. Handler on behalf of Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc. (Handler, Jonathan)
September 2, 2021 Filing 20 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 11/22/2021 (McKillop, Matthew)
August 31, 2021 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION Regarding Briefing Schedule and Page Limits for Anticipated Motions to Dismiss by Defendants by Glock, Inc..(Durney, Peter)
August 31, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Glock, Inc.. (Durney, Peter) Modified on 9/2/2021 (McKillop, Matthew).
August 31, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Durney on behalf of Glock, Inc. (Durney, Peter)
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. Century International Arms, Inc. served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brunell, Richard)
August 20, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc. served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
August 13, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc. served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
August 13, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc. served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
August 13, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. Glock, Inc. served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. Colt's Manufacturing Co., Inc. served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. Beretta USA Corp. served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. Acknowledgement filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Brunell, Richard)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nicholas W. Shadowen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jonathan E. Lowy. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Steve D. Shadowen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicholas Shadowen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8888107 by Estados Unidos Mexicanos.(Brunell, Richard)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jonathan W. Lowy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8888100 by Estados Unidos Mexicanos.(Brunell, Richard)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Steve D. Shadowen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8888085 by Estados Unidos Mexicanos.(Brunell, Richard)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Brunell on behalf of Estados Unidos Mexicanos (Brunell, Richard)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8887732 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form 4-4-11)(Brunell, Richard)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8887732 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Estados Unidos Mexicanos. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form 4-4-11)(Brunell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estados Unidos Mexicanos v. Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estados Unidos Mexicanos
Represented By: Richard M. Brunell
Represented By: Jonathan Lowy
Represented By: Nicholas Shadowen
Represented By: Steve D. Shadowen
Represented By: Tina J. Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Wesson Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew E. Lelling
Represented By: Anthony Dick
Represented By: Noel J. Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Firearms Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: James W. Porter, II
Represented By: Richard W. Kinney, III
Represented By: Trevor J. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beretta USA Corp.
Represented By: Michael A. Savino
Represented By: Wendy Kennedy Venoit
Represented By: John Kennedy McDonald
Represented By: Michael B. DE Leeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baretta Holdings SPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt's Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Christine M. Netski
Represented By: John G. O'Neill
Represented By: Michael L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Renzulli
Represented By: Jeffrey M Malsch
Represented By: John F. Renzulli
Represented By: Peter M. Durney
Represented By: Patricia A. Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock Ges.m.b.H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sturm Ruger & Co., Inc.
Represented By: James B. Vogts
Represented By: Jonathan I. Handler
Represented By: Keith H. Bensten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc. doing business as Interstate Arms
Represented By: Nora R. Adukonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century International Arms, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Pisciotti
Represented By: Danny Lallis
Represented By: Ryan Erdreich
Represented By: Joseph G. Yannetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt's Manufacturing Co. LLC
Represented By: Christine M. Netski
Represented By: John G. O'Neill
Represented By: Michael L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Law Professors
Represented By: Ellen Valentik Leonida
Represented By: Matthew B. Borden
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Non-Party Proposed Amici
Represented By: David Duncan
Represented By: Ellen Valentik Leonida
Represented By: Matthew B. Borden
Represented By: Sarah Salomon
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Max Bernstein
Represented By: Thomas M. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Professors Of Transnational Litigation
Represented By: Edward V. Colbert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Connecticut, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Delaware, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: District of Columbia
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hawaii, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Illinois, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maryland, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michigan, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Minnesota, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Jersey, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Mexico, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oregon, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Antigua & Barbuda
Represented By: Crystal Lohmann Parker
Represented By: Aaron Haier
Represented By: James Mandilk
Represented By: Julia Tarver-Mason Wood
Represented By: William Taylor
Represented By: Roberto Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Belize
Represented By: Crystal Lohmann Parker
Represented By: Julia Tarver-Mason Wood
Represented By: Roberto Gonzalez
Represented By: Aaron Haier
Represented By: James Mandilk
Represented By: William Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Association for Public Policies d/b/a/ the Latin American and Caribbean Network for Human Security ("SEHLAC")
Represented By: Crystal Lohmann Parker
Represented By: Julia Tarver-Mason Wood
Represented By: Roberto Gonzalez
Represented By: Aaron Haier
Represented By: James Mandilk
Represented By: William Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: James Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gun Violence Prevention Groups
Represented By: Lawson E. Fite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?