Residential Energy Services Network, Inc. v. Greater Boston Green, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Residential Energy Services Network, Inc.
Defendant: Greater Boston Green, LLC, Dmitry M Sharshunskiy and David Amatuni
Case Number: 1:2021cv11275
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed David Amatuni served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Polansky, Kevin)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nicolette Corso Vilmos. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, [Exhibits 1 and 2] by Residential Energy Services Network, Inc.. (Polansky, Kevin)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicolette Corso Vilmos Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8889019 by Residential Energy Services Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification)(Polansky, Kevin)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Amatuni, Dmitry M Sharshunskiy, Greater Boston Green, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8888996 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Residential Energy Services Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 AO120)(Polansky, Kevin) Modified on 8/5/2021 to docket AO 120 as a separate entry, see dkt # 4(Pacho, Arnold).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Residential Energy Services Network, Inc. v. Greater Boston Green, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Residential Energy Services Network, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P. Polansky
Represented By: Nicolette Corso Vilmos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Boston Green, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dmitry M Sharshunskiy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Amatuni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?