Kerrissey et al v. Bruce et al
Plaintiff: Joseph B Kerrissey and JDHE Holding
Defendant: William Bruce, David Deloury, James Mitchell and Gary Cruickshank
Case Number: 1:2021cv11277
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Gary Cruickshank, James Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Volpe, Christina)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. D. #13 Motion to Stay is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to plead or otherwise move in response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is stayed until 14 days after the Court rules on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadline to Respond to Amended Complaint by Gary Cruickshank.(Whitcomb, Jonathan) (Main Document 13 replaced on 8/26/2021) (Halley, Taylor).
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Part 2 of 3, #2 State Court Record Part 3 of 3)(Kelley, Kristyn)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Whitcomb on behalf of Gary Cruickshank (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by JDHE Holding, Joseph B Kerrissey.(Hamer, Robert)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to file a response to the answer by 8/26/21. (McKillop, Matthew)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by James Mitchell.(Kelley, Kristyn)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by William Bruce re #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . (Kelly, Charles)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against William Bruce by William Bruce.(Kelly, Charles)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to August 26, 2021 to Respond to the Amended Complaint (McKillop, Matthew)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to August 26, 2021 to Respond to the Amended Complaint by Gary Cruickshank.(Volpe, Christina)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James Mitchell ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8889836 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9)(Kelley, Kristyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerrissey et al v. Bruce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph B Kerrissey
Represented By: Robert L. Hamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JDHE Holding
Represented By: Robert L. Hamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bruce
Represented By: Charles S. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Deloury
Represented By: Daniel D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mitchell
Represented By: Kristyn M. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Cruickshank
Represented By: Christina M. Volpe
Represented By: Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?