Northeast Bank v. ROCF-SPE1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Northeast Bank
Defendant: ROCF-SPE1, LLC and Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC
Trustee: PNC Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11295
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint by PNC Bank, N.A..(Robey-Phillips, Emily)
September 10, 2021 Filing 32 Opposition re #20 MOTION for Relief from Trustee Process Attachment with certificate of service filed by Northeast Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit of Counsel)(Ganz, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2021 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northeast Bank. (Poynor, Alissa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by ROCF-SPE1, LLC, Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC.(McCraw, Thomas)
September 8, 2021 Filing 29 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #20 MOTION for Relief from Trustee Process Attachment Responses due by 9/10/2021 (Halley, Taylor)
September 8, 2021 Filing 28 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 10, 2021 to Respond to Complaint (Halley, Taylor)
September 8, 2021 Filing 27 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Halley, Taylor)
September 2, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 10, 2021 to For Northeast Bank to respond to Defendant's Motion for Relief from Trustee Process Attachment with certificate of service by Northeast Bank.(Poynor, Alissa) (Modified on 9/3/2021 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew).
August 27, 2021 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 10, 2021 to Respond to Complaint (Stipulated) by ROCF-SPE1, LLC, Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC.(McCraw, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 24 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Brian Doherty, #6 Exhibit Notice of Acceptance Into BLS, #7 Exhibit Motion for Special Process Server, #8 Exhibit Motion for TRO and Short Order Notice on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Exhibit Order Granting TRO, #10 Exhibit Ex Parte Emergency Motion for Trustee Process Attachment, #11 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(McCraw, Thomas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Stipulated) by PNC Bank, N.A..(Robey-Phillips, Emily)
August 20, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Elias in Opposition re #20 MOTION for Relief from Trustee Process Attachment filed by ROCF-SPE1, LLC, Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Errata 10)(McCraw, Thomas)
August 20, 2021 Filing 21 Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION for Relief from Trustee Process Attachment filed by ROCF-SPE1, LLC, Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC filed by ROCF-SPE1, LLC, Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC. (McCraw, Thomas) Modified on 9/8/2021 (Halley, Taylor).
August 20, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM TRUSTEE PROCESS ATTACHMENT by ROCF-SPE1, LLC, Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC by ROCF-SPE1, LLC, Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC.(McCraw, Thomas) Modified on 9/8/2021 (Halley, Taylor). Modified on 9/8/2021 (Halley, Taylor). Modified on 9/8/2021 (Halley, Taylor).
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Andrew J. Soven. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
August 19, 2021 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew J. Soven Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8911316 by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Robey-Phillips, Emily)
August 19, 2021 Filing 17 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Vernon E. Inge, Jr. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
August 19, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alissa L. Poynor on behalf of Northeast Bank (Poynor, Alissa)
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Vernon E. Inge, Jr. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8908488 by ROCF-SPE1, LLC, Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Vernon E. Inge, Jr.)(McCraw, Thomas)
August 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by PNC Bank, N.A. of Consent to Removal (Robey-Phillips, Emily)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PNC Bank, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for PNC Bank, N.A... (Robey-Phillips, Emily)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily A. Robey-Phillips on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. (Robey-Phillips, Emily)
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Ganz, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Ganz, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed (Ganz, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS to Trustee Returned Executed (Ganz, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed ROCF-SPE1, LLC served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Ganz, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Ganz, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Kelly, Danielle)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, with attachments and Certificate of Service by ROCF-SPE1, LLC, Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC. (McCraw, Thomas)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ROCF-SPE1, LLC, Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8895206 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McCraw, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northeast Bank v. ROCF-SPE1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northeast Bank
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Ganz
Represented By: Alissa L. Poynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCF-SPE1, LLC
Represented By: Thomas K. McCraw, Jr.
Represented By: Vernon E. Inge, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Oak Capital Fund, LLC
Represented By: Thomas K. McCraw, Jr.
Represented By: Vernon E. Inge, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew J. Soven
Represented By: Emily A. Robey-Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?