Merch Traffic, LLC v. Does 1-100 et al
Plaintiff: Merch Traffic, LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Jane Does 1-100 and XYZ Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv11340
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION and seizure order, entered.(Urso, Lisa)
September 15, 2021 Filing 17 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Show Cause Hearing held on 9/15/2021. No one appears for defts. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Oliverio) Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ, 1:21-cv-11340-RWZ(Urso, Lisa)
September 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Show Cause Hearing REset for 9/15/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proofs of Service)(Oliverio, Michael)
September 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oliverio, Michael)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 RECEIPT: Receipt # 1BST086191 for monies received on 8/25/21 in amount of $ 1000.00, re: #11 Temporary Restraining Order, Set Hearings.. (Barbosa, Nilsa)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 RECEIPT: Receipt # 1BST086190 for monies received on 8/25/21 in amount of $ 1000.00, re: (11 in 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ, 11 in 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ) Temporary Restraining Order, Set Hearings.. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11339-RWZ et al.(Barbosa, Nilsa)
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ORDER entered. TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ( Show Cause Hearing set for 9/14/2021 09:45 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel.)(Urso, Lisa)
August 18, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Michael Lawrence Oliverio on behalf of Merch Traffic, LLC filed by on behalf of Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Oliverio, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Seizure Order and Order to Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction and Seizure Order Should Not Issue by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oliverio, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Oliverio, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Merch Traffic, LLC of Related Cases (Oliverio, Michael)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8908307 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Merch Traffic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Sheet)(Oliverio, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merch Traffic, LLC v. Does 1-100 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merch Traffic, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?