Mora v. AngioDynamics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cela Mora
Defendant: AngioDynamics, Inc. and Navilyst Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv11352
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 24 Opposition re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AngioDynamics, Inc., Navilyst Medical, Inc.. (Hennessey, Colleen)
September 28, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AngioDynamics, Inc., Navilyst Medical, Inc.. (Hennessey, Colleen)
September 16, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cela Mora. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Santiago, Jill)
September 16, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cela Mora.(Santiago, Jill)
September 14, 2021 Filing 20 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
September 13, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by AngioDynamics, Inc., Navilyst Medical, Inc..(Hennessey, Colleen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cela Mora. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Evans, Adam)
September 8, 2021 Filing 17 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Folan, Karen)
September 7, 2021 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Cela Mora.(Santiago, Jill)
September 2, 2021 Filing 15 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cortney M. Godin terminated (Folan, Karen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AngioDynamics, Inc., Navilyst Medical, Inc..(Godin, Cortney)
September 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen M. Hennessey on behalf of AngioDynamics, Inc., Navilyst Medical, Inc. (Hennessey, Colleen)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Adam M. Evans. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Adam M Evans Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8922103 by Cela Mora. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Adam M Evans)(Santiago, Jill)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Godin, Cortney)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AngioDynamics, Inc., Navilyst Medical, Inc.. (Godin, Cortney)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AngioDynamics, Inc., Navilyst Medical, Inc..(Godin, Cortney)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Stephen C. Matthews. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Warnock, Douglas)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Stephen C. Matthews Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8909716 by AngioDynamics, Inc., Navilyst Medical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Godin, Cortney)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navilyst Medical, Inc.. (Godin, Cortney)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AngioDynamics, Inc.. (Godin, Cortney)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AngioDynamics, Inc., Navilyst Medical, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8909675 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Godin, Cortney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mora v. AngioDynamics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cela Mora
Represented By: Jill M. Santiago
Represented By: Adam M. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AngioDynamics, Inc.
Represented By: Cortney M. Godin
Represented By: Colleen M. Hennessey
Represented By: Stephen C. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navilyst Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Cortney M. Godin
Represented By: Colleen M. Hennessey
Represented By: Stephen C. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?