Davis et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Merhle Davis and Thomas Yetter
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv11474
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Angel Kelley
Referring Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Angel Kelley added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Ben Barnow. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Pacho, Arnold)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ben Barnow. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8989732 by Merhle Davis, Thomas Yetter. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3 of the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts)(Pastor, David) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/5/2021) (Pacho, Arnold). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/5/2021) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 10/5/2021 to replace document with the correct attorney being admitted (Pacho, Arnold).
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 , #5 , and #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Anthony L. Parkhill, Andrew W. Ferich, and Robert R. Ahdoot. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert R. Ahdoot Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8983277 by Merhle Davis, Thomas Yetter. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3 of the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts)(Pastor, David)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew W. Ferich Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8982208 by Merhle Davis, Thomas Yetter. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3 of the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts)(Pastor, David)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Anthony L. Parkhill Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-8982183 by Merhle Davis, Thomas Yetter. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3 of the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts)(Pastor, David)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8937351 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Merhle Davis, Thomas Yetter, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Pastor, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merhle Davis
Represented By: David Pastor
Represented By: Andrew Ferich
Represented By: Anthony L. Parkhill
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Robert R Ahdoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Yetter
Represented By: David Pastor
Represented By: Andrew Ferich
Represented By: Anthony L. Parkhill
Represented By: Ben Barnow
Represented By: Robert R Ahdoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?